Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 493 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6247 Week
» 34205 Month
» 68847 Year
» 1290412 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4805   09/09/1938
LNER (1946 1st) 734   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 834   08/09/1946
BR 60834   13/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Thu 09/09/1938 to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)
Withdrawal Thu 19/03/1964 off Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)
Scrapping During 11/1964 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 25 yrs, 6 mths , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Into Cowlairs Works for cutting up 11/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill (New) 09/09/1938
STM St Margarets 23/10/1942
HAY Haymarket 17/04/1943
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 12/11/1950
   Withdrawn 19/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge m/e 30/11/1950
WDN   19/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/09/1938 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2944)
19/04/1944 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3270)
08/03/1946 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3044)
13/05/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2918)
03/02/1950 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3227)
01/09/1951 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29500)
29/12/1955 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29453)
26/10/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29424)
14/01/1960 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29381)
29/06/1962 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29540)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Inverurie Works 22/03/1939 22/03/1939 1 day Unclassified  
Darlington Works 11/04/1939 28/04/1939 18 days Unclassified
Alteration to tender
 
Cowlairs Works 27/01/1940 27/01/1940 1 day Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 18/05/1940 15/06/1940 29 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 01/03/1941 05/04/1941 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 03/10/1942 14/11/1942 43 days General
MLS regulator off
 
Darlington Works 17/03/1944 19/04/1944 34 days General
Boiler number 3270 (Diagram 109)
 
Cowlairs Works 03/06/1944 10/06/1944 8 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 30/07/1945 24/08/1945 26 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 26/01/1946 08/03/1946 42 days General
Boiler number 3044 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 21/09/1946 16/11/1946 57 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 08/10/1947 31/10/1947 24 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 30/03/1948 13/05/1948 45 days General
Boiler number 29501 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60834
 
Darlington Works 18/05/1948 28/05/1948 11 days Unclassified
Special painting
 
Darlington Works 31/12/1949 03/02/1950 35 days General
Boiler number 3227 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 09/07/1951 01/09/1951 55 days General
Boiler number 29500 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 11/05/1953 20/06/1953 41 days Light Intermediate  
Darlington Works 25/11/1955 29/12/1955 35 days General
Boiler number 29453 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 26/09/1957 26/10/1957 31 days General
Boiler number 29424 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 28/10/1957 30/10/1957 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 08/12/1959 14/01/1960 38 days General
Boiler number 29381 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 18/05/1962 29/06/1962 43 days General
Boiler number 29540 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 30/07/1962 10/08/1962 12 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/11/1962 05/12/1962 29 days Light Casual  
Inverurie Works 30/04/1963 01/05/1963 2 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/09/1938 To Service To service as LNER Number 4805
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
22/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/03/1939. Dep: 22/03/1939.    
11/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/04/1939. Dep: 28/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Alteration to tender
   
27/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 27/01/1940.    
18/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/05/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940.    
01/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1941. Dep: 05/04/1941.    
03/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1942. Dep: 14/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
MLS regulator off
   
23/10/1942 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (STM)    
17/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
17/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1944. Dep: 19/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3270 (Diagram 109)
   
03/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/06/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944.    
30/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/07/1945. Dep: 24/08/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 734 but not taken up    
26/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1946. Dep: 08/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3044 (Diagram 109)
   
08/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 834    
21/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/09/1946. Dep: 16/11/1946.    
08/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/10/1947. Dep: 31/10/1947.    
30/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1948. Dep: 13/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29501 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60834
   
18/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/05/1948. Dep: 28/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Special painting
   
31/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1949. Dep: 03/02/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3227 (Diagram 109)
   
12/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
09/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1951. Dep: 01/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29500 (Diagram 109)
   
11/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/05/1953. Dep: 20/06/1953.    
25/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1955. Dep: 29/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29453 (Diagram 109)
   
26/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1957. Dep: 26/10/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29424 (Diagram 109)
   
28/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/10/1957. Dep: 30/10/1957.    
08/12/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1959. Dep: 14/01/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29381 (Diagram 109)
   
18/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1962. Dep: 29/06/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29540 (Diagram 109)
   
30/07/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/07/1962. Dep: 10/08/1962.    
07/11/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/11/1962. Dep: 05/12/1962.    
30/04/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/04/1963. Dep: 01/05/1963.    
19/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 60834 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
11/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev