|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1940 | 03/02/1940 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1940 | 03/08/1940 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/12/1942 | 13/02/1943 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1943 | 25/12/1943 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/06/1944 | 17/06/1944 | 15 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/09/1945 | 13/10/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3037 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/12/1946 | 25/01/1947 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/05/1949 | 10/06/1949 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29369 (Diagram 109) Modified pony truck Renumbered to BR 60841 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1951 | 20/07/1951 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/04/1953 | 29/05/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29433 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1955 | 11/05/1955 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29389 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/04/1957 | 25/05/1957 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 06/08/1958 | 11/08/1958 | 6 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1959 | 15/08/1959 | 121 days | General | Boiler number 29483 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1959 | 04/09/1959 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/09/1959 | 29/09/1959 | 16 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1962 | 23/08/1962 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 28052 (Diagram 109) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/11/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4812 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1778 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
27/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 03/02/1940. | ||
06/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1940. Dep: 03/08/1940. | ||
03/11/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
26/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1942. Dep: 13/02/1943. | ||
11/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/12/1943. Dep: 25/12/1943. | ||
03/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1944. Dep: 17/06/1944. | ||
19/08/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
01/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1945. Dep: 13/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3037 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 741 but not taken up | ||
24/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 841 | ||
22/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947. | ||
05/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1949. Dep: 10/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29369 (Diagram 109) Modified pony truck Renumbered to BR 60841 |
||
13/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/06/1951. Dep: 20/07/1951. | ||
30/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1953. Dep: 29/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29433 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1955. Dep: 11/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29389 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/08/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
18/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/04/1957. Dep: 25/05/1957. | ||
06/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/08/1958. Dep: 11/08/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
17/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1959. Dep: 15/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29483 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
24/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/08/1959. Dep: 04/09/1959. | ||
14/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/09/1959. Dep: 29/09/1959. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
09/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
03/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1962. Dep: 23/08/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28052 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60841 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
21/11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |