|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1939 | 13/05/1939 | 50 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/07/1939 | 19/08/1939 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1941 | 29/03/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1941 | 13/12/1941 | 39 days | Heavy | After collision |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/06/1943 | 14/08/1943 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1943 | 13/11/1943 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/09/1944 | 30/09/1944 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3509 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1946 | 04/05/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1947 | 22/04/1947 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/08/1949 | 22/09/1949 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 9191 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60845 |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1952 | 08/04/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29404 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1952 | 15/10/1952 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1954 | 03/12/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29394 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1957 | 08/03/1957 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29440 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1958 | 26/09/1958 | 4 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 15/04/1959 | 03/07/1959 | 80 days | General | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1959 | 31/07/1959 | 24 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/02/1953 | Swindon Works | Arrivals from Darlington for fitting of A.T.C. Gear and other W.R. modifications, 78002. Tender B.R. 3. 941/52. 78003. Tender B.R. 3. 942/52 and 78004. Tender B.R. 3. 943/52, these are due to be allocated to the Central Wales Division. Dean 0-6-0s withdrawn from scrapping, noted in East Yard, Reception Shed, Dump and C. Shop : 2350 -; 2401 (89B); 2408 -; 2449 (89A); 2462 -; 2468 (89B); 2515 (85C); 2534 (82D); 2537 (86C); 2543, 2573 (81D). Eastern Region 60845 was noted fitted with Indicator Shelter on front end. | SLS/195304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/02/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4816 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1786 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
25/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/03/1939. Dep: 13/05/1939. | ||
29/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/07/1939. Dep: 19/08/1939. | ||
02/08/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
22/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1941. Dep: 29/03/1941. | ||
05/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 05/11/1941. Dep: 13/12/1941. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
26/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943. | ||
30/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/10/1943. Dep: 13/11/1943. | ||
11/03/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
02/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3509 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 745 but not taken up | ||
20/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/04/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946. | ||
28/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 845 | ||
22/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1947. Dep: 22/04/1947. | ||
22/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
08/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1949. Dep: 22/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9191 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60845 |
||
09/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
09/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1952. Dep: 08/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29404 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/05/1952 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
21/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/09/1952. Dep: 15/10/1952. | ||
22/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
20/10/1952 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
05/04/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
04/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1954. Dep: 03/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29394 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
16/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
06/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1957. Dep: 08/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29440 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/09/1958. Dep: 26/09/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
15/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1959. Dep: 03/07/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
08/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/07/1959. Dep: 31/07/1959. | ||
23/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60845 from New England (34E) | ||
13/12/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |