Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 245 Today
» 1084 Yesterday
» 245 Week
» 30535 Month
» 333725 Year
» 1555290 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4819 on 03/03/1939
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 748 on Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 848   15/12/1946
British Railways 60848   27/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 03/03/1939 to St Margarets (STM)
Withdrawal w/e Mon 16/07/1962 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping Wed 01/08/1962 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 23 yrs, 4 mths , 13 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington Works for cutting up 1/8/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STM St Margarets (New) on 03/03/1939
HAY Haymarket m/e 05/1941
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill on 02/05/1943
HAY Haymarket on 29/10/1944
64A St Margarets on 11/12/1949
52A Gateshead on 09/09/1956
50A York (North) on 15/09/1957
51A Darlington on 08/06/1958
50A York (North) on 10/09/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 16/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STM St Margarets w/e 17/12/1949
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 15/09/1956
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 50A York (North) 3w/e 30/09/1961
WDN   w/e 16/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/03/1939 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3003)
04/05/1944 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3101)
08/12/1945 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3438)
02/05/1947 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2907)
27/05/1949 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3010)
11/07/1953 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29469)
12/10/1955 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28053)
07/06/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29393)
08/10/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
12/03/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
01/04/1960 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28077)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 13/09/1939 30/09/1939 18 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 11/06/1940 05/07/1940 25 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/10/1941 28/11/1941 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/02/1943 20/03/1943 26 days General  
Darlington Works 05/04/1944 04/05/1944 30 days General
Boiler number 29497 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 09/04/1945 15/05/1945 37 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 05/11/1945 08/12/1945 34 days General
Boiler number 29449 (Diagram 109)
 
Cowlairs Works 22/08/1946 24/08/1946 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 19/03/1947 02/05/1947 45 days General
Boiler number 2907 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 23/04/1949 27/05/1949 35 days General
Boiler number 29522 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60848
 
Darlington Works 12/12/1951 18/01/1952 38 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 12/06/1953 11/07/1953 30 days General
Boiler number 29469 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 13/07/1953 16/07/1953 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 05/08/1953 08/08/1953 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 13/09/1955 12/10/1955 30 days General
Boiler number 28053 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 10/05/1957 07/06/1957 29 days General
Boiler number 29393 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 03/10/1958 08/10/1958 6 days Unclassified
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 09/03/1959 12/03/1959 4 days Unclassified
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 22/02/1960 01/04/1960 40 days General
Boiler number 28077 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 22/11/1960 06/01/1961 46 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 01/09/1961 09/10/1961 39 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/03/1939 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4819
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to St Margarets (STM)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
13/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/09/1939. Dep: 30/09/1939.    
11/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1940. Dep: 05/07/1940.    
05/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
17/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1941. Dep: 28/11/1941.    
23/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1943. Dep: 20/03/1943.    
02/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
05/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1944. Dep: 04/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29497 (Diagram 109)
   
29/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
09/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/04/1945. Dep: 15/05/1945.    
05/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29449 (Diagram 109)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 748 but not taken up    
22/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/08/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946.    
15/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 848    
19/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1947. Dep: 02/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2907 (Diagram 109)
   
23/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1949. Dep: 27/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29522 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60848
   
11/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
12/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/12/1951. Dep: 18/01/1952.    
12/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1953. Dep: 11/07/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29469 (Diagram 109)
   
13/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/07/1953. Dep: 16/07/1953.    
05/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1953. Dep: 08/08/1953.    
13/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1955. Dep: 12/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28053 (Diagram 109)
   
09/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
10/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1957. Dep: 07/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29393 (Diagram 109)
   
15/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
08/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
03/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/10/1958. Dep: 08/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
09/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1959. Dep: 12/03/1959.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
22/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1960. Dep: 01/04/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28077 (Diagram 109)
   
22/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/11/1960. Dep: 06/01/1961.    
01/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/09/1961. Dep: 09/10/1961.    
10/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
16/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 60848 from York (North) (50A)    

prev prev