|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 13/09/1939 | 30/09/1939 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1940 | 05/07/1940 | 25 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1941 | 28/11/1941 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1943 | 20/03/1943 | 26 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1944 | 04/05/1944 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29497 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1945 | 15/05/1945 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 05/11/1945 | 08/12/1945 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29449 (Diagram 109) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/08/1946 | 24/08/1946 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1947 | 02/05/1947 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2907 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1949 | 27/05/1949 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29522 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60848 |
||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1951 | 18/01/1952 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1953 | 11/07/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29469 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/07/1953 | 16/07/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1953 | 08/08/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1955 | 12/10/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28053 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/05/1957 | 07/06/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29393 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1958 | 08/10/1958 | 6 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1959 | 12/03/1959 | 4 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 22/02/1960 | 01/04/1960 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28077 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/11/1960 | 06/01/1961 | 46 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1961 | 09/10/1961 | 39 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1946 | General | At this date (30/11/1946) only the following Scottish Area engines still require to be renumbered: 4488, 4491, 2745, 4819, 4891, 4898, 3658, 3682, 3692, 1996, 9765, 6897, 3057, 9499, 9886, 9384, 6398, 6399, 6401, 265, 320, 9201, 9204, 9368, 9255, 9263, 9429, 9046, 2980, 9632, 9644, 9668, 9757, 9790, 7348, 9524, 9527; a total of 37, or 3 per cent. of the total stock | SLS/194701 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/03/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4819 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1789 Allocated to St Margarets (STM) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
13/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/09/1939. Dep: 30/09/1939. | ||
11/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1940. Dep: 05/07/1940. | ||
05/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
17/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1941. Dep: 28/11/1941. | ||
23/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1943. Dep: 20/03/1943. | ||
02/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
05/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1944. Dep: 04/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29497 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
09/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/04/1945. Dep: 15/05/1945. | ||
05/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29449 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 748 but not taken up | ||
22/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/08/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946. | ||
15/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 848 | ||
19/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1947. Dep: 02/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2907 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1949. Dep: 27/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29522 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60848 |
||
11/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
17/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
12/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/12/1951. Dep: 18/01/1952. | ||
12/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1953. Dep: 11/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29469 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/07/1953. Dep: 16/07/1953. | ||
05/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1953. Dep: 08/08/1953. | ||
13/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1955. Dep: 12/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28053 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
10/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1957. Dep: 07/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29393 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
03/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/10/1958. Dep: 08/10/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
09/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1959. Dep: 12/03/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
22/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1960. Dep: 01/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28077 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/11/1960. Dep: 06/01/1961. | ||
01/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/09/1961. Dep: 09/10/1961. | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
16/07/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60848 from York (North) (50A) | ||
01/08/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |