|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 23/08/1939 | 24/08/1939 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/02/1940 | 17/02/1940 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1941 | 15/02/1941 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/06/1942 | 01/08/1942 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/12/1942 | 12/12/1942 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/06/1943 | 07/08/1943 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1944 | 18/10/1944 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2918 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/06/1945 | 18/07/1945 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1946 | 18/05/1946 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3363 (Diagram 109) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/05/1947 | 10/05/1947 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 02/12/1947 | 30/01/1948 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E851 |
||
Darlington Works | 05/12/1949 | 07/01/1950 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2942 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60851 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/08/1950 | 19/08/1950 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1951 | 24/01/1952 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29484 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1952 | 07/02/1952 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/02/1952 | 19/02/1952 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1953 | 02/09/1953 | 70 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1954 | 06/01/1955 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29527 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1956 | 13/08/1956 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 29488 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1958 | 05/06/1958 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29456 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1960 | 18/08/1960 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 28079 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1960 | 08/09/1960 | 10 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/09/1963 | Inverurie Works (Being cup up) | In Shops: 44724, 45066, 80126; awaiting shops-42737, 45475. Shopped during period 5/8-6/9: 42129, 65234, 65908/22, D6140/3/4. Scrapped during same period: 57565, 61260, 65210/41/60, 67606/15/49/74. Being cup up: 60851, 65316. Awaiting cut up: 60959, 64568, 90536/42. | SLS/196310 |
10/10/1963 | Inverurie Works (Scrapped) | 42737, 42909, 45475, 65918. In Scrap Yard: 60819/27, 64627, 65253/341. Shopped four weeks ended 4/10-44724, 45066, 80126, D6148/50, D8031; Scrapped same period-45049, 60851/959, 64568, 65316, 90193, 90536/42. | SLS/196311 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/03/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4822 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1792 Allocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
01/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
23/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/08/1939. Dep: 24/08/1939. | ||
09/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/02/1940. Dep: 17/02/1940. | ||
18/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1941. Dep: 15/02/1941. | ||
27/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/06/1942. Dep: 01/08/1942. | ||
05/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/12/1942. Dep: 12/12/1942. | ||
26/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1943. Dep: 07/08/1943. | ||
13/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1944. Dep: 18/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2918 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/06/1945. Dep: 18/07/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 751 but not taken up | ||
16/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1946. Dep: 18/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3363 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 851 | ||
04/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/05/1947. Dep: 10/05/1947. | ||
02/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1947. Dep: 30/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E851 |
||
05/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1949. Dep: 07/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2942 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60851 |
||
05/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/08/1950. Dep: 19/08/1950. | ||
19/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1951. Dep: 24/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29484 (Diagram 109) |
||
30/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/01/1952. Dep: 07/02/1952. | ||
15/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/02/1952. Dep: 19/02/1952. | ||
25/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 25/06/1953. Dep: 02/09/1953. | ||
30/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1954. Dep: 06/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29527 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1956. Dep: 13/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29488 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1958. Dep: 05/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29456 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1960. Dep: 18/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28079 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
30/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/08/1960. Dep: 08/09/1960. | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60851 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
13/09/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |