|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1940 | 04/01/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1943 | 22/05/1943 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/05/1945 | 16/06/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1945 | 12/01/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/01/1947 | 15/03/1947 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 3042 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1949 | 15/07/1949 | 38 days | General | Plain tender sides Boiler number 29365 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60855 |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/05/1951 | 19/06/1951 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/02/1952 | 12/03/1952 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1953 | 15/07/1953 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29424 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/09/1953 | 07/09/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1955 | 05/04/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29369 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1957 | 21/02/1957 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29534 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/02/1957 | 27/02/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1957 | 09/04/1957 | 27 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1958 | 22/01/1959 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29494 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 16/09/1960 | 22/09/1960 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/07/1961 | 03/10/1961 | 89 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1962 | 25/04/1962 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29348 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1962 | 17/05/1962 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1962 | 05/06/1962 | 12 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/12/1945 | Doncaster Works | Engines on works recently include 2000. On 29/12, during three hours observation at Doncaster, 15 V2's were observed, including 4826. The latter had been damaged at the front in a collision between an up Leeds express and a freight train at Lofthouse. It was coupled to 598, also dead, the locos being hauled by 4242. A three-coach local left in the up direction behind J39 1471 (BLA). | SLS/194604 |
09/07/1961 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. | SLS/196108 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
04/07/1964 | Darlington Works (Stripping Shop) | Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. | SLS/196408 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/04/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4826 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1796 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
18/07/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
30/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1940. Dep: 04/01/1941. | ||
17/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1943. Dep: 22/05/1943. | ||
05/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1945. Dep: 16/06/1945. | ||
29/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/12/1945. Dep: 12/01/1946. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 755 but not taken up | ||
22/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 855 | ||
29/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3042 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1949. Dep: 15/07/1949. Work undertaken: Plain tender sides Boiler number 29365 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60855 |
||
20/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/05/1951. Dep: 19/06/1951. | ||
25/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/02/1952. Dep: 12/03/1952. | ||
08/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1953. Dep: 15/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29424 (Diagram 109) |
||
04/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/09/1953. Dep: 07/09/1953. | ||
01/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
08/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1955. Dep: 05/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29369 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
02/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
16/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1957. Dep: 21/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29534 (Diagram 109) |
||
26/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1957. Dep: 27/02/1957. | ||
14/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/03/1957. Dep: 09/04/1957. | ||
20/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
02/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
12/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1958. Dep: 22/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29494 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
16/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1960. Dep: 22/09/1960. | ||
07/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/07/1961. Dep: 03/10/1961. | ||
12/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1962. Dep: 25/04/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29348 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
11/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/05/1962. Dep: 17/05/1962. | ||
25/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1962. Dep: 05/06/1962. | ||
13/04/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60855 from York (North) (50A) | ||
19/05/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |