|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 11/11/1939 | 18/11/1939 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1941 | 25/04/1941 | 14 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1942 | 28/03/1942 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/06/1943 | 31/07/1943 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1945 | 08/09/1945 | 64 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1946 | 13/04/1946 | 29 days | General | After collision Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 762 |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1947 | 22/01/1948 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 3109 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E862 |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/01/1949 | 12/01/1949 | 11 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 60862 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/03/1949 | 08/04/1949 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/12/1949 | 10/02/1950 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 29378 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/08/1950 | 01/09/1950 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/09/1951 | 05/10/1951 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1953 | 12/02/1953 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/08/1953 | 18/09/1953 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29432 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/04/1955 | 27/05/1955 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28051 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1957 | 06/03/1957 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2905 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1957 | 21/03/1957 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/03/1957 | 18/04/1957 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1959 | 13/02/1959 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29345 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 11/04/1961 | 20/04/1961 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1961 | 07/10/1961 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29481 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/02/1946 | G.N. Section | The locos involved in the Potter's Bar collision were: 4876, down express, 4833, up express and 2679 up local train. etc:) | SLS/194604 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/06/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4833 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1803 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
11/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/11/1939. Dep: 18/11/1939. | ||
16/11/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
12/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1941. Dep: 25/04/1941. | ||
21/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/03/1942. Dep: 28/03/1942. | ||
19/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1943. Dep: 31/07/1943. | ||
07/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945. | ||
16/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1946. Dep: 13/04/1946. Work undertaken: After collision Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 762 |
||
22/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 862 | ||
09/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1947. Dep: 22/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3109 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E862 |
||
02/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/01/1949. Dep: 12/01/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60862 |
||
18/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/03/1949. Dep: 08/04/1949. | ||
25/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1949. Dep: 10/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29378 (Diagram 109) |
||
19/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
25/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
28/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/08/1950. Dep: 01/09/1950. | ||
03/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/09/1951. Dep: 05/10/1951. | ||
06/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/02/1953. Dep: 12/02/1953. | ||
12/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1953. Dep: 18/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29432 (Diagram 109) |
||
19/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1955. Dep: 27/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28051 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1957. Dep: 06/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2905 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
12/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/03/1957. Dep: 21/03/1957. | ||
28/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/03/1957. Dep: 18/04/1957. | ||
15/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1959. Dep: 13/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29345 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
11/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/04/1961. Dep: 20/04/1961. | ||
06/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1961. Dep: 07/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29481 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
21/04/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
16/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60862 from New England (34E) | ||
27/11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |