|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 19/07/1941 | 30/08/1941 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/09/1943 | 30/10/1943 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/07/1945 | 01/09/1945 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1947 | 15/02/1947 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1948 | 09/04/1948 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60866 |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1949 | 22/01/1949 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/05/1950 | 05/07/1950 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 9234 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/02/1952 | 04/03/1952 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1952 | 23/05/1952 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 29411 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/04/1954 | 20/05/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29412 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/02/1956 | 13/03/1956 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29416 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1958 | 22/05/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29356 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1960 | 15/10/1960 | 125 days | General | Boiler number 29488 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1948 | General | Amongst locomotives carrying cast smokebox numberplates, the following have been noted: Nos. 60007/33/54, 60107, 60511 an 60866. | SLS/194806 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/07/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4837 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1807 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
19/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1941. Dep: 30/08/1941. | ||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
25/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1943. Dep: 30/10/1943. | ||
12/11/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
14/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 766 but not taken up | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
06/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 866 | ||
11/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1947. Dep: 15/02/1947. | ||
27/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1948. Dep: 09/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60866 |
||
14/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/01/1949. Dep: 22/01/1949. | ||
20/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1950. Dep: 05/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9234 (Diagram 109) |
||
19/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/02/1952. Dep: 04/03/1952. | ||
26/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1952. Dep: 23/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29411 (Diagram 109) |
||
21/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1954. Dep: 20/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29412 (Diagram 109) |
||
04/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1956. Dep: 13/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29416 (Diagram 109) |
||
21/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1958. Dep: 22/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29356 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
16/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
13/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1960. Dep: 15/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29488 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
11/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60866 from New England (34E) | ||
24/05/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |