|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1941 | 19/04/1941 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1943 | 27/03/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/11/1944 | 30/12/1944 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1946 | 02/11/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3095 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1948 | 07/07/1948 | 45 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60870 |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1950 | 17/07/1950 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 8931 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1952 | 05/02/1952 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1952 | 17/04/1952 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29405 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/06/1954 | 21/07/1954 | 42 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/06/1956 | 31/07/1956 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29384 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/08/1956 | 09/08/1956 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1958 | 28/08/1958 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 29505 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1959 | 30/04/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1959 | 23/09/1959 | 85 days | Light Casual | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1962 | 02/03/1962 | 45 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/06/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works on 26/6 included; Nos. 1, 29, 30/6/9, 65/7, 104, 518, 818/83, 1083, 1128, 1800/24, 2821, 60042/49/97, 60515, 60870, 61830. The first of the new 'A.1' 4-6-2's No. 60114, was nearing completion here in early July and was being proceeded with faster than No. 60539. | SLS/194808 |
28/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Outside Crimpsall) | New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196203 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/08/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4841 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1811 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
14/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
18/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
08/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1941. Dep: 19/04/1941. | ||
27/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1943. Dep: 27/03/1943. | ||
18/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1944. Dep: 30/12/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 770 but not taken up | ||
05/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3095 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 870 | ||
24/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1948. Dep: 07/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60870 |
||
08/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1950. Dep: 17/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8931 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/01/1952. Dep: 05/02/1952. | ||
12/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1952. Dep: 17/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29405 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/06/1954. Dep: 21/07/1954. | ||
19/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1956. Dep: 31/07/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29384 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
07/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/08/1956. Dep: 09/08/1956. | ||
11/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1958. Dep: 28/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29505 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
28/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/04/1959. Dep: 30/04/1959. | ||
01/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/07/1959. Dep: 23/09/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
17/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1962. Dep: 02/03/1962. | ||
16/07/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60870 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
29/07/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |