|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 15/08/1942 | 12/09/1942 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/07/1944 | 19/08/1944 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1946 | 02/11/1946 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/05/1948 | 16/06/1948 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 3124 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60877 |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/06/1950 | 27/07/1950 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1952 | 19/03/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29399 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1954 | 19/02/1954 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29402 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1954 | 11/03/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1956 | 21/03/1956 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29348 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1957 | 08/11/1957 | 50 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 16/05/1958 | 13/06/1958 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/11/1958 | 12/01/1959 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 29368 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1959 | 27/01/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/02/1959 | 03/03/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 27/09/1961 | 28/10/1961 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28088 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. | SLS/194812 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/06/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4848 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1913 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
15/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1942. Dep: 12/09/1942. | ||
15/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1944. Dep: 19/08/1944. | ||
22/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 777 but not taken up | ||
05/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 877 | ||
28/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
05/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946. | ||
20/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1948. Dep: 16/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3124 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60877 |
||
14/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1950. Dep: 27/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1952. Dep: 19/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29399 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1954. Dep: 19/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29402 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/03/1954. Dep: 11/03/1954. | ||
18/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1956. Dep: 21/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29348 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
24/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
10/03/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
19/05/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
28/07/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
20/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/09/1957. Dep: 08/11/1957. | ||
20/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
16/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/05/1958. Dep: 13/06/1958. | ||
02/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
06/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1958. Dep: 12/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29368 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
23/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/01/1959. Dep: 27/01/1959. | ||
26/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1959. Dep: 03/03/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
27/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1961. Dep: 28/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28088 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
13/02/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60877 from York (North) (50A) | ||
04/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |