|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 26/03/1940 | 15/04/1940 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1941 | 05/02/1941 | 33 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1941 | 22/10/1941 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29497 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/10/1943 | 22/11/1943 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3058 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/02/1946 | 23/03/1946 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2934 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1947 | 10/01/1948 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2903 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1949 | 27/08/1949 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2905 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1951 | 21/04/1951 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1952 | 08/02/1952 | 13 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1952 | 18/11/1952 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29471 (Diagram 109) |
||
Gateshead Works | 12/10/1953 | 15/10/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1954 | 01/05/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 29542 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1954 | 05/05/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/05/1955 | 06/07/1955 | 58 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1956 | 04/07/1956 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28055 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/12/1958 | 13/01/1959 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29504 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 19/01/1959 | 26/01/1959 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1959 | 13/03/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 19/09/1961 | 28/09/1961 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/02/1962 | 13/04/1962 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28065 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 18/04/1962 | 02/05/1962 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1962 | 22/05/1962 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/05/1962 | 06/06/1962 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/07/1962 | 23/08/1962 | 28 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
19/09/1964 | Darlington MPD (Shed) | On shed-diesel bays: D5170/2, dead line: 69020, 90444/9; Roundhouse: D3228, D2706/31/2, D2318/36/40, D3229, DEPT87, 68011/37/43/7/50/3/60. Shed: 60024 ex works, 60036/45/808/84/5, 62001, 62002 ex works, 62003/43/4/8/64; 61030, 62368, 68010/4/46,151/4, 90011/4/98, 90361/556 ex works, 90688, 42405/77, 43050/6/7, 43102/29/40 and 63460 awaiting move to Stratford. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/11/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4856 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1816 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
26/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/03/1940. Dep: 15/04/1940. | ||
04/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/01/1941. Dep: 05/02/1941. | ||
09/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1941. Dep: 22/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29497 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
19/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1943. Dep: 22/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3058 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 785 but not taken up | ||
02/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1946. Dep: 23/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2934 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 885 | ||
09/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1947. Dep: 10/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2903 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60885 | ||
18/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1949. Dep: 27/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2905 (Diagram 109) |
||
19/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
20/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/03/1951. Dep: 21/04/1951. | ||
29/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
05/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
06/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
26/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
27/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/01/1952. Dep: 08/02/1952. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
17/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1952. Dep: 18/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29471 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/10/1953. Dep: 15/10/1953. | ||
15/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
05/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1954. Dep: 01/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29542 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/05/1954. Dep: 05/05/1954. | ||
10/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/05/1955. Dep: 06/07/1955. | ||
25/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1956. Dep: 04/07/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28055 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
05/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1958. Dep: 13/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29504 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
19/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/01/1959. Dep: 26/01/1959. | ||
11/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/03/1959. Dep: 13/03/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
08/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
19/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/09/1961. Dep: 28/09/1961. | ||
28/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1962. Dep: 13/04/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28065 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
18/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/04/1962. Dep: 02/05/1962. | ||
15/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/05/1962. Dep: 22/05/1962. | ||
30/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/05/1962. Dep: 06/06/1962. | ||
27/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/07/1962. Dep: 23/08/1962. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
06/09/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60885 from Darlington (51A) | ||
10/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |