|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 25/10/1940 | 26/11/1940 | 33 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1941 | 14/06/1941 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 3058 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1941 | 20/06/1941 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1943 | 04/09/1943 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29376 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/08/1944 | 23/09/1944 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/09/1945 | 06/10/1945 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/07/1947 | 30/08/1947 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3146 (Diagram 109) Modified pony truck |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1949 | 28/05/1949 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 3383 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1951 | 10/02/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 29470 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/02/1953 | 21/03/1953 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29507 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1953 | 15/04/1953 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/12/1954 | 29/01/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29441 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1956 | 28/05/1956 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29390 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Gateshead Works | 22/11/1956 | 29/11/1956 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1957 | 07/05/1957 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1958 | 23/05/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29549 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 25/02/1959 | 27/02/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1959 | 07/08/1959 | 71 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 04/10/1960 | 09/12/1960 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 29476 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/01/1961 | 07/01/1961 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1961 | 26/01/1961 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1963 | 17/05/1963 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28076 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/10/1965 | 19/10/1965 | 8 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/11/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4857 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1817 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
25/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/10/1940. Dep: 26/11/1940. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
22/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1941. Dep: 14/06/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3058 (Diagram 109) |
||
17/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/06/1941. Dep: 20/06/1941. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
28/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29376 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/08/1944. Dep: 23/09/1944. | ||
01/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 786 but not taken up | ||
06/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
20/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 886 | ||
24/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1947. Dep: 30/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3146 (Diagram 109) Modified pony truck |
||
12/11/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60886 | ||
20/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1949. Dep: 28/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3383 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1951. Dep: 10/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29470 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
05/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
06/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
26/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
16/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1953. Dep: 21/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29507 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/04/1953. Dep: 15/04/1953. | ||
15/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
29/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1954. Dep: 29/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29441 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1956. Dep: 28/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29390 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
22/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/11/1956. Dep: 29/11/1956. | ||
17/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/04/1957. Dep: 07/05/1957. | ||
22/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1958. Dep: 23/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29549 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
25/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/02/1959. Dep: 27/02/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
29/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/05/1959. Dep: 07/08/1959. | ||
04/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1960. Dep: 09/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29476 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/01/1961. Dep: 07/01/1961. | ||
26/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 26/01/1961. Dep: 26/01/1961. | ||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
08/04/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1963. Dep: 17/05/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28076 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/10/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/10/1965. Dep: 19/10/1965. | ||
10/04/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60886 from York (North) (50A) | ||
06/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |