Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 489 Today
» 1118 Yesterday
» 4125 Week
» 23770 Month
» 58412 Year
» 1279977 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4859   07/12/1939
LNER (1946 1st) 788   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 888   22/09/1946
BR 60888   20/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Sat 07/12/1939 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Scrapping Fri 27/09/1963 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 23 yrs , 22 dys

Notes
Notes Engine cut up at Cowlairs Works 27/9/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HTN Heaton (New) 07/12/1939
GHD Gateshead 28/03/1943
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 13/10/1945
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill m/e 03/12/1945
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/12/1939 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3085)
01/08/1941 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3084)
13/04/1943 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2895)
26/05/1945 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2998)
31/05/1947 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2963)
20/05/1949 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3225)
06/07/1951 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29483)
30/04/1955 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29480)
21/12/1956 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29471)
18/11/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
18/11/1958 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29477)
05/11/1960 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29414)
05/11/1960 Electrical elements of ATC fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 09/06/1941 01/08/1941 54 days General
Boiler number 3084 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 08/03/1943 13/04/1943 37 days General
Boiler number 2895 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 07/04/1945 26/05/1945 50 days General
Boiler number 2998 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 18/04/1947 31/05/1947 44 days General
Boiler number 29481 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 16/04/1949 20/05/1949 35 days General
Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60888
 
Cowlairs Works 03/09/1949 17/09/1949 15 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 07/06/1951 06/07/1951 30 days General
Boiler number 29483 (Diagram 109)
 
Cowlairs Works 20/12/1951 22/12/1951 3 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 16/01/1952 19/01/1952 4 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 07/05/1953 07/05/1953 1 day Special
Height and weight adjustment
 
Darlington Works 06/07/1953 26/08/1953 52 days Light Intermediate  
Darlington Works 11/01/1954 03/02/1954 24 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/04/1955 30/04/1955 30 days General
Boiler number 2905 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 20/11/1956 21/12/1956 32 days General
Boiler number 3044 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 27/12/1956 28/12/1956 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 08/10/1958 18/11/1958 42 days General
Boiler number 3099 (Diagram 109)
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 22/09/1960 05/11/1960 45 days General
Boiler number 29414 (Diagram 109)
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 21/11/1960 01/12/1960 11 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/12/1939 To Service To service as LNER Number 4859
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Heaton (HTN)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
09/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1941. Dep: 01/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3084 (Diagram 109)
   
08/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1943. Dep: 13/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2895 (Diagram 109)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
07/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1945. Dep: 26/05/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2998 (Diagram 109)
   
13/10/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 788 but not taken up    
22/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 888    
18/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1947. Dep: 31/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29481 (Diagram 109)
   
16/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1949. Dep: 20/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60888
   
03/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/09/1949. Dep: 17/09/1949.    
07/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1951. Dep: 06/07/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29483 (Diagram 109)
   
20/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1951. Dep: 22/12/1951.    
16/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/01/1952. Dep: 19/01/1952.    
07/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Special) - Arr: 07/05/1953. Dep: 07/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Height and weight adjustment
   
06/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 06/07/1953. Dep: 26/08/1953.    
11/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/01/1954. Dep: 03/02/1954.    
01/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1955. Dep: 30/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2905 (Diagram 109)
   
20/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1956. Dep: 21/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3044 (Diagram 109)
   
27/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/12/1956. Dep: 28/12/1956.    
08/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1958. Dep: 18/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3099 (Diagram 109)
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
22/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1960. Dep: 05/11/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29414 (Diagram 109)
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
21/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/11/1960. Dep: 01/12/1960.    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 60888 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
27/09/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev