|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 07/07/1941 | 02/09/1941 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 8931 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/10/1942 | 06/11/1942 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/12/1942 | 12/01/1943 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1943 | 05/08/1943 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 9234 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1945 | 01/12/1945 | 64 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/12/1947 | 07/02/1948 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29510 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E891 |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/10/1949 | 12/11/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 3293 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60891 |
||
Darlington Works | 05/09/1951 | 06/10/1951 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29509 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/05/1953 | 25/06/1953 | 30 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28060 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/12/1953 | 15/01/1954 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1954 | 14/10/1954 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/01/1956 | 06/02/1956 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29500 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1956 | 10/10/1956 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 29/11/1956 | 08/01/1957 | 41 days | Heavy Casual | Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1957 | 13/12/1957 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29381 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/10/1958 | 20/10/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1959 | 29/10/1959 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29503 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1961 | 17/11/1961 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29515 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1961 | 21/12/1961 | 10 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted in the Paint Shop at the beginning of November included: Nos. 60030/91, 60109/11, 60891, 60900/38/40, 61208, 61819/91, 61906/53/87, 67379, 69527/47. No. 67387 has been fitted for 'Pull and Push' working. | SLS/194912 |
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/12/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4862 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1822 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
07/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1941. Dep: 02/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8931 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/10/1942. Dep: 06/11/1942. | ||
29/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/12/1942. Dep: 12/01/1943. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
24/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1943. Dep: 05/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9234 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 791 but not taken up | ||
06/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
20/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 891 | ||
31/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1947. Dep: 07/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29510 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E891 |
||
10/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1949. Dep: 12/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3293 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60891 |
||
05/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1951. Dep: 06/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29509 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 27/05/1953. Dep: 25/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28060 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/12/1953. Dep: 15/01/1954. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
13/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/09/1954. Dep: 14/10/1954. | ||
05/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1956. Dep: 06/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29500 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 10/10/1956. Dep: 10/10/1956. | ||
29/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/11/1956. Dep: 08/01/1957. Work undertaken: Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
13/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1957. Dep: 13/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29381 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/10/1958. Dep: 20/10/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
25/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1959. Dep: 29/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29503 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
17/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1961. Dep: 17/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29515 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
12/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/12/1961. Dep: 21/12/1961. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
12/10/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60891 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
12/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |