|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 28/07/1942 | 02/09/1942 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/09/1944 | 19/10/1944 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1946 | 24/08/1946 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29349 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 892 |
||
Darlington Works | 26/07/1948 | 27/08/1948 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29408 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60892 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/01/1950 | 10/03/1950 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 3220 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/03/1952 | 17/04/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29536 (Diagram 109) |
||
Gateshead Works | 05/08/1952 | 23/08/1952 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1953 | 04/02/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1954 | 05/06/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29498 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/06/1954 | 10/06/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1954 | 08/07/1954 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/04/1955 | 12/05/1955 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 18/10/1956 | 20/11/1956 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29396 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1959 | 11/02/1959 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29519 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1961 | 23/03/1961 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29410 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/05/1962 | Bathgate MPD | Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. | SLS/196206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/01/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4863 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1823 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
28/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1942. Dep: 02/09/1942. | ||
13/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1944. Dep: 19/10/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 792 but not taken up | ||
17/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29349 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 892 |
||
26/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1948. Dep: 27/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29408 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60892 |
||
13/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1950. Dep: 10/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3220 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
19/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1952. Dep: 17/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29536 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/08/1952. Dep: 23/08/1952. | ||
02/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/02/1953. Dep: 04/02/1953. | ||
07/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1954. Dep: 05/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29498 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/06/1954. Dep: 10/06/1954. | ||
23/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/06/1954. Dep: 08/07/1954. | ||
12/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/04/1955. Dep: 12/05/1955. | ||
18/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1956. Dep: 20/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29396 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1959. Dep: 11/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29519 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
09/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1961. Dep: 23/03/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29410 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
21/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60892 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |