|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 27/12/1941 | 07/02/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1944 | 05/02/1944 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/07/1945 | 01/09/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/12/1946 | 18/01/1947 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3045 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1948 | 11/02/1948 | 20 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E893 |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/12/1948 | 07/02/1949 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 3142 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60893 |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1950 | 06/12/1950 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29346 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1952 | 06/02/1952 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/11/1952 | 19/12/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29422 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1955 | 18/06/1955 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 10506 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1957 | 01/06/1957 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 29449 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1957 | 05/06/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/09/1958 | 22/09/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1959 | 14/04/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1959 | 20/08/1959 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 29546 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/03/1960 | 19/05/1960 | 80 days | Heavy Casual | Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1960 | 02/06/1960 | 14 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. | SLS/194903 |
27/03/1953 | Merchant Navy problems - \"foreign\" locos drafted in | The temporary withdrawal of the 'Merchant Navy' engines for special examination, has led to the drafting of a number of strangers from other regions. Several V2 have been seen, among them 60829 an 60893; also the following Bl, Nos. 61133, 61192, 61354. From the L.M.R. come 45061, 45130 (latter seen passing Basingstoke on 30th May), and from W.R. at least, 70017 an 70024. There are certainly others, but at the time of going to press, no official notes have given details. | SLS/195306 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/01/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4864 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1824 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
27/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1941. Dep: 07/02/1942. | ||
01/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1944. Dep: 05/02/1944. | ||
21/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 793 but not taken up | ||
13/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 893 | ||
07/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1946. Dep: 18/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3045 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/01/1948. Dep: 11/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E893 |
||
30/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1948. Dep: 07/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3142 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60893 |
||
04/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1950. Dep: 06/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29346 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/01/1952. Dep: 06/02/1952. | ||
18/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1952. Dep: 19/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29422 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/05/1953 | Allocation | Loaned to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
28/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
09/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1955. Dep: 18/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10506 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1957. Dep: 01/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29449 (Diagram 109) |
||
04/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/06/1957. Dep: 05/06/1957. | ||
13/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
16/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1958. Dep: 22/09/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
14/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
10/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/04/1959. Dep: 14/04/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
30/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1959. Dep: 20/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29546 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 01/03/1960. Dep: 19/05/1960. Work undertaken: Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
20/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/05/1960. Dep: 02/06/1960. | ||
23/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60893 from New England (34E) | ||
12/12/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |