|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 05/08/1941 | 17/09/1941 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29398 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/04/1943 | 18/05/1943 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3113 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/06/1945 | 28/07/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1946 | 19/03/1946 | 25 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 795 |
||
Darlington Works | 01/04/1946 | 18/04/1946 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1947 | 05/04/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3107 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1947 | 15/05/1947 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1949 | 04/06/1949 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2958 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1951 | 12/04/1951 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29464 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/03/1953 | 18/04/1953 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28059 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1953 | 09/05/1953 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1954 | 20/03/1954 | 12 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1955 | 09/07/1955 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29442 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1957 | 13/03/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29344 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/11/1958 | 12/11/1958 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1959 | 17/06/1959 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28050 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1959 | 01/07/1959 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1962 | 19/06/1962 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29388 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1945 | Leeds Area | Latest B.16/3 843 appeared on 2.5.p.m. Darlington-Leeds turn on 20/9. B.17 2826 was noted on 3/10 working north on a Class A Goods on the main line near Thirsk. N.13 2405 and J.21 1593 proceeded north through Ripon on 5/10 coupled together (1593 'dead') apparently going to works. The chief effect of the new timetables seems to have been a reduction in the loading of long distance passenger trains. The 9.20 a.m. Newcastle-Liverpool E.P. during the first eleven days of the new timetable consisted of 14-16 bogies, compared with 15-18 previously. It has now been cut to 12 daily and the train is still double-headed from Ripon to Leeds. During the summer the relief to this train usually was made up of 12-14 bogies, and was always worked by one engine! Ex-N.E. Z have been much in evidence on Neville Hill turns lately. Since 4/10 the following combinations have been noted on the 9.20 Newcastle-Liverpool: 2204 & 4866; 2193, 2206 an 722 all piloting 2568 on different days; 2208 & 3648; and 729 & 211 on the 9.0 Liverpool-Newcastle: On 12/10 the relief 9.20 Newcastle-Liverpool was worked by K.2 4651 with 10 bogies, and piloted from Ripon by A.6 688 bunker first. D.21 1245 which was awaiting works at the Darlington shed visit in July, has reappeared, and was first noted on 8/10, piloting D.20 1210 on the 9.40 a.m. Leeds to Middlesbrough (a regular double-headed working). | SLS/194601 |
08/07/1962 | York South MPD | Stored in the old south shed are 60887/95/939/82 all ex works, 61039, 61240 and 90467/571/8/663, also four BRCW d.m.us. damaged in a collision in March, viz. uE50543/76/9201/22, all noted 8th July. | SLS/196208 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/01/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4866 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1826 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
05/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1941. Dep: 17/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29398 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
19/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1943. Dep: 18/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3113 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1945. Dep: 28/07/1945. | ||
03/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
23/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1946. Dep: 19/03/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 795 |
||
01/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/04/1946. Dep: 18/04/1946. | ||
26/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 895 | ||
08/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1947. Dep: 05/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3107 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 15/05/1947. Dep: 15/05/1947. | ||
21/01/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60895 | ||
26/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1949. Dep: 04/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2958 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1951. Dep: 12/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29464 (Diagram 109) |
||
17/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1953. Dep: 18/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28059 (Diagram 109) |
||
04/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/05/1953. Dep: 09/05/1953. | ||
19/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
29/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
09/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/03/1954. Dep: 20/03/1954. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
28/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1955. Dep: 09/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29442 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1957. Dep: 13/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29344 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/11/1958. Dep: 12/11/1958. | ||
15/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1959. Dep: 17/06/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28050 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
23/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/06/1959. Dep: 01/07/1959. | ||
15/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1962. Dep: 19/06/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29388 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60895 from York (North) (50A) | ||
11/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |