|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1941 | 04/10/1941 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1943 | 08/05/1943 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/03/1945 | 19/05/1945 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/11/1946 | 04/01/1947 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3087 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1949 | 12/04/1949 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29368 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60896 |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/06/1951 | 24/07/1951 | 41 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1953 | 17/04/1953 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29352 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1955 | 24/02/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29430 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1957 | 06/04/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29421 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1957 | 12/04/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1958 | 11/11/1958 | 8 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 10/09/1959 | 08/10/1959 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29449 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 21/10/1959 | 21/10/1959 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1961 | 13/12/1961 | 21 days | Light Casual | After collision |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/02/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4867 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1827 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
23/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1941. Dep: 04/10/1941. | ||
17/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1943. Dep: 08/05/1943. | ||
31/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1945. Dep: 19/05/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 796 but not taken up | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 896 | ||
23/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1946. Dep: 04/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3087 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1949. Dep: 12/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29368 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60896 |
||
14/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/06/1951. Dep: 24/07/1951. | ||
16/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1953. Dep: 17/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29352 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/05/1953 | Allocation | Loaned to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
28/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
30/08/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
24/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1955. Dep: 24/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29430 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1957. Dep: 06/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29421 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1957. Dep: 12/04/1957. | ||
04/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/11/1958. Dep: 11/11/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
10/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1959. Dep: 08/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29449 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
21/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1959. Dep: 21/10/1959. | ||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
09/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
23/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/11/1961. Dep: 13/12/1961. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
23/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60896 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
10/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |