|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 01/03/1940 | 08/03/1940 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1942 | 28/02/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1944 | 13/05/1944 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1946 | 13/04/1946 | 43 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 799 |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/04/1947 | 02/06/1947 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29383 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/07/1949 | 31/08/1949 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 3113 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60899 |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/07/1951 | 31/07/1951 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29372 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1952 | 04/02/1952 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/02/1954 | 26/03/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 29494 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1955 | 09/06/1955 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/09/1955 | 28/10/1955 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1956 | 10/08/1956 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29372 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1957 | 04/09/1957 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1958 | 02/09/1958 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 28060 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 05/05/1959 | 06/05/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 17/05/1961 | 12/08/1961 | 88 days | General | Boiler number 29453 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
09/07/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/02/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4870 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1830 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
01/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/03/1940. Dep: 08/03/1940. | ||
17/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1942. Dep: 28/02/1942. | ||
08/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1944. Dep: 13/05/1944. | ||
02/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1946. Dep: 13/04/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 799 |
||
26/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 899 | ||
24/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1947. Dep: 02/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29383 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1949. Dep: 31/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3113 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60899 |
||
02/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1951. Dep: 31/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29372 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/01/1952. Dep: 04/02/1952. | ||
18/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
28/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1954. Dep: 26/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29494 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/05/1955. Dep: 09/06/1955. | ||
22/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/09/1955. Dep: 28/10/1955. | ||
11/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1956. Dep: 10/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29372 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
09/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/08/1957. Dep: 04/09/1957. | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
01/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1958. Dep: 02/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28060 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
05/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/05/1959. Dep: 06/05/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
17/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1961. Dep: 12/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29453 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60899 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
13/11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |