|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 08/09/1941 | 23/10/1941 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 3091 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1944 | 01/04/1944 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29448 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1945 | 02/02/1946 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1947 | 08/11/1947 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1949 | 17/12/1949 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3509 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60901 |
||
Gateshead Works | 18/06/1951 | 20/06/1951 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1952 | 22/02/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29526 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1953 | 23/01/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2918 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1954 | 27/01/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1955 | 01/03/1955 | 57 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1956 | 10/05/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29531 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/08/1957 | 19/09/1957 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29373 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/09/1958 | 19/09/1958 | 5 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1959 | 08/01/1959 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1959 | 30/04/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 15/09/1959 | 14/10/1959 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29366 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1962 | 10/04/1962 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29502 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/03/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4872 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1832 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
08/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1941. Dep: 23/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3091 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1944. Dep: 01/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29448 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1945. Dep: 02/02/1946. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 801 but not taken up | ||
24/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 901 | ||
29/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1947. Dep: 08/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 109) |
||
17/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1949. Dep: 17/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3509 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60901 |
||
18/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/06/1951. Dep: 20/06/1951. | ||
23/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1952. Dep: 22/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29526 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
14/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
21/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1953. Dep: 23/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2918 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/01/1954. Dep: 27/01/1954. | ||
04/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/01/1955. Dep: 01/03/1955. | ||
05/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1956. Dep: 10/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29531 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
16/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1957. Dep: 19/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29373 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
15/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/09/1958. Dep: 19/09/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
08/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 08/01/1959. Dep: 08/01/1959. | ||
28/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/04/1959. Dep: 30/04/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
15/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1959. Dep: 14/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29366 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
06/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1962. Dep: 10/04/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29502 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
13/12/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
14/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60901 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
07/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Ellis Metals: Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell |