|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 10/10/1942 | 14/11/1942 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1944 | 30/09/1944 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1946 | 24/08/1946 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3058 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/06/1948 | 13/08/1948 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 9232 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60913 |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1950 | 09/06/1950 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 9546 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/06/1950 | 21/06/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1951 | 20/12/1951 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29386 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/04/1953 | 20/05/1953 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1954 | 07/04/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29345 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1956 | 13/06/1956 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29544 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1958 | 18/11/1958 | 8 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1959 | 12/05/1959 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 29365 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1962 | 03/03/1962 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29370 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1963 | 26/02/1963 | 16 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/06/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4884 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1844 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
10/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1942. Dep: 14/11/1942. | ||
26/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 813 but not taken up | ||
13/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3058 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 913 | ||
25/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1948. Dep: 13/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9232 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60913 |
||
07/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1950. Dep: 09/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9546 (Diagram 109) |
||
19/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/06/1950. Dep: 21/06/1950. | ||
24/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
30/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
14/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
20/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
21/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1951. Dep: 20/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29386 (Diagram 109) |
||
30/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/04/1953. Dep: 20/05/1953. | ||
08/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1954. Dep: 07/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29345 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1956. Dep: 13/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29544 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
11/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/11/1958. Dep: 18/11/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
13/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1959. Dep: 12/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29365 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
29/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1962. Dep: 03/03/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29370 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
13/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
11/02/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/02/1963. Dep: 26/02/1963. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
12/10/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60913 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
24/10/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |