Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 159 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4671 Week
» 27177 Month
» 330367 Year
» 1551932 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4890 on 07/09/1941
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 819 on Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 919   22/09/1946
British Railways 60919   01/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Fri 07/09/1941 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Fri 02/09/1966 off Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)
Scrapping During 10/1966 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)
Service Life 24 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Arnott Young, Old Kirkpatrick, 10/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HTN Heaton (New) on 07/09/1941
GHD Gateshead on 28/03/1943
TWD Tweedmouth on 14/02/1944
GHD Gateshead on 24/04/1944
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill on 13/10/1945
62B Dundee Tay Bridge on 11/05/1964
   Withdrawn on 02/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 5w/e 13/06/1964
WDN   on 02/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/09/1941 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3160)
15/07/1943 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 9229)
01/10/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3003)
09/11/1950 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29445)
26/05/1954 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29528)
16/08/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29466)
04/06/1959 Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
04/06/1959 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29525)
13/01/1961 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29350)
13/01/1961 Smith speedometer fitted
14/08/1963 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29476)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 21/04/1942 06/05/1942 16 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 09/06/1943 15/07/1943 37 days General
Boiler number 29495 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 10/03/1945 21/04/1945 43 days General  
Darlington Works 11/01/1947 08/03/1947 57 days General  
Darlington Works 16/04/1948 14/05/1948 29 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 09/09/1948 01/10/1948 23 days General
Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60919
 
Darlington Works 04/10/1948 14/10/1948 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 15/08/1949 19/10/1949 66 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 09/10/1950 09/11/1950 32 days General
Boiler number 29445 (Diagram 109)
 
Inverurie Works 17/04/1951 19/04/1951 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/10/1952 01/11/1952 24 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 13/11/1952 16/11/1952 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 28/04/1954 26/05/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 29528 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 12/11/1955 17/12/1955 36 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 19/12/1955 20/12/1955 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/07/1957 16/08/1957 47 days General
Boiler number 29466 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 29/04/1959 04/06/1959 37 days General
Boiler number 29525 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
 
Darlington Works 01/12/1960 13/01/1961 44 days General
Boiler number 29350 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
 
Darlington Works 18/06/1963 14/08/1963 58 days General
Boiler number 29476 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 26/09/1963 19/10/1963 24 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 06/07/1965 20/08/1965 46 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order.
Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year.
No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751.
Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420.
SLS/194808
31/01/1956 York MPD December, 1955-January, 1956. On 28/12/55 60152 (64B), ex-works, was in York shed yard, and 60161 (64B) in similar circumstances on 5/1/56. 67764 (53B) was also at York on 28/12/55 en route for Darlington Works, whilst 67724 (30A) which had called at York, in rather poor condition, on 9/11/55, returned southward bound from Darlington Works on 12/1/56 in a more attractive state. On 29/12/55 new B.R. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73106 from Doncaster was at York, with 76024 (52C) passing through for Doncaster Works. On the following day a very smart 60919 (61B) worked an up goods into Dringhouses during the course of running-in. from Darlington. On 4/1/56 44592 (5B) was an unusual visitor to York, whilst 63760 (54B) put in an appearance while on route for overhaul at Gorton.
On the same day three very rusty and forlorn 'Sl' 0-8-4Ts were at York en route for scrapping at Darlington, namely 69900 (36A), 69902 (36B), 69904 (36B). 69900/04 were hauled in by 61188 (38A) in particularly smart trim. 69902 was still at York on the following day which was also marked by the unusual simultaneous appearance in York station of two 'B17s', 61626 (31A) and 61656 (32A); the former brought in the 7.20 a.m. Colchester to Newcastle train which has also recently produced Woodford V2s 60890 an 60915 instead of the more-usual Doncaster or March engine. On 12/1/56 unusual visitors were 43088 (35A), and from the L.M.R. 44692 (24A) and 45211 (25G). The beginning of the year saw the number of 'J25s' in store at York south shed reduced to two, i.e., 65675 an 65677, but the ex-L.M.S.. shed still contains 69864 (50G), 62702 (50A), 62746 (50D) and 62761 (50D) in store. 62730 (50A) is still dumped out of service in the north shed yard but 62345 is at last showing signs of awakening from her-very prolonged hibernation.
SLS/195605

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/09/1941 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4890
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Heaton (HTN)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
21/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/04/1942. Dep: 06/05/1942.    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
09/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1943. Dep: 15/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29495 (Diagram 109)
   
14/02/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD)    
24/04/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
10/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945.    
13/10/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 819 but not taken up    
22/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 919    
11/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947.    
16/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/04/1948. Dep: 14/05/1948.    
09/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1948. Dep: 01/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60919
   
04/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/10/1948. Dep: 14/10/1948.    
15/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/08/1949. Dep: 19/10/1949.    
09/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1950. Dep: 09/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29445 (Diagram 109)
   
17/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/04/1951. Dep: 19/04/1951.    
09/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/10/1952. Dep: 01/11/1952.    
13/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/11/1952. Dep: 16/11/1952.    
28/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1954. Dep: 26/05/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29528 (Diagram 109)
   
12/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/11/1955. Dep: 17/12/1955.    
19/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/12/1955. Dep: 20/12/1955.    
01/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1957. Dep: 16/08/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29466 (Diagram 109)
   
29/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1959. Dep: 04/06/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29525 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
   
01/12/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1960. Dep: 13/01/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29350 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
   
18/06/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1963. Dep: 14/08/1963.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29476 (Diagram 109)
   
26/09/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/09/1963. Dep: 19/10/1963.    
11/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
06/07/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/07/1965. Dep: 20/08/1965.    
02/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 60919 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    

prev prev