|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1943 | 04/12/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/04/1945 | 02/06/1945 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1946 | 09/11/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3356 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1948 | 06/08/1948 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 3289 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60920 |
||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1948 | 18/08/1948 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1948 | 20/09/1948 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1949 | 04/02/1949 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1950 | 11/10/1950 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29450 (Diagram 109) |
||
Gateshead Works | 16/10/1950 | 18/10/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1950 | 27/10/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1951 | 29/11/1951 | 11 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1952 | 13/12/1952 | 42 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gateshead Works | 22/12/1952 | 23/12/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1953 | 14/12/1953 | 41 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1954 | 13/04/1954 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 07/12/1955 | 13/01/1955 | -327 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/03/1957 | 05/04/1957 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1959 | 06/11/1959 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29516 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 10/05/1961 | 27/06/1961 | 49 days | Light Casual | After collision |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1946 | General | At this date (30/11/1946) only the following Scottish Area engines still require to be renumbered: 4488, 4491, 2745, 4819, 4891, 4898, 3658, 3682, 3692, 1996, 9765, 6897, 3057, 9499, 9886, 9384, 6398, 6399, 6401, 265, 320, 9201, 9204, 9368, 9255, 9263, 9429, 9046, 2980, 9632, 9644, 9668, 9757, 9790, 7348, 9524, 9527; a total of 37, or 3 per cent. of the total stock | SLS/194701 |
31/07/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order. Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year. No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751. Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420. |
SLS/194808 |
31/08/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August | SLS/194810 |
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
05/05/1962 | Bathgate MPD | Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. | SLS/196206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/10/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4891 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1869 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
06/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1943. Dep: 04/12/1943. | ||
14/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1945. Dep: 02/06/1945. | ||
13/10/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 820 but not taken up | ||
05/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3356 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 920 | ||
11/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1948. Dep: 06/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3289 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60920 |
||
09/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/08/1948. Dep: 18/08/1948. | ||
01/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/09/1948. Dep: 20/09/1948. | ||
07/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/01/1949. Dep: 04/02/1949. | ||
11/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1950. Dep: 11/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29450 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/10/1950. Dep: 18/10/1950. | ||
25/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/10/1950. Dep: 27/10/1950. | ||
19/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/11/1951. Dep: 29/11/1951. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
02/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/11/1952. Dep: 13/12/1952. | ||
22/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/12/1952. Dep: 23/12/1952. | ||
04/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/11/1953. Dep: 14/12/1953. | ||
11/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/03/1954. Dep: 13/04/1954. | ||
13/01/1955 | Modification | Diagram 109 number 29463 boiler fitted | ||
07/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1955. Dep: 13/01/1955. | ||
01/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/03/1957. Dep: 05/04/1957. | ||
22/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
05/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1959. Dep: 06/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29516 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
10/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
10/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/05/1961. Dep: 27/06/1961. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60920 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
14/10/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |