|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 04/09/1943 | 09/10/1943 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/05/1945 | 23/06/1945 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/12/1945 | 04/01/1946 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/12/1946 | 15/02/1947 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 3360 (Diagram 109) Steam Brakes fitted Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 927 |
||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1948 | 22/10/1948 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2998 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60927 |
||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1950 | 06/04/1950 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 2900 (Diagram 109) |
||
Gateshead Works | 13/04/1950 | 14/04/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 08/05/1951 | 10/05/1951 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/12/1951 | 11/01/1952 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29520 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/12/1953 | 09/01/1954 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29531 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1956 | 23/02/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29535 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/06/1956 | 26/06/1956 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1957 | 21/01/1958 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29469 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1959 | 22/01/1960 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28074 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1960 | 19/02/1960 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1962 | 30/10/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1946 | General | At this date (30/11/1946) only the following Scottish Area engines still require to be renumbered: 4488, 4491, 2745, 4819, 4891, 4898, 3658, 3682, 3692, 1996, 9765, 6897, 3057, 9499, 9886, 9384, 6398, 6399, 6401, 265, 320, 9201, 9204, 9368, 9255, 9263, 9429, 9046, 2980, 9632, 9644, 9668, 9757, 9790, 7348, 9524, 9527; a total of 37, or 3 per cent. of the total stock | SLS/194701 |
05/05/1962 | Bathgate MPD | Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. | SLS/196206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/12/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4898 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1876 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
04/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1943. Dep: 09/10/1943. | ||
05/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1945. Dep: 23/06/1945. | ||
13/10/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
20/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/12/1945. Dep: 04/01/1946. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 827 but not taken up | ||
14/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1946. Dep: 15/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3360 (Diagram 109) Steam Brakes fitted Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 927 |
||
23/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1948. Dep: 22/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2998 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60927 |
||
25/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1950. Dep: 06/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2900 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1950. Dep: 14/04/1950. | ||
08/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/05/1951. Dep: 10/05/1951. | ||
05/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1951. Dep: 11/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29520 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1953. Dep: 09/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29531 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1956. Dep: 23/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29535 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/06/1956. Dep: 26/06/1956. | ||
28/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
12/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1957. Dep: 21/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29469 (Diagram 109) |
||
21/04/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
21/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1959. Dep: 22/01/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28074 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/02/1960. Dep: 19/02/1960. | ||
11/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
30/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 30/10/1962. Dep: 30/10/1962. | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60927 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
04/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |