Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 757 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2872 Week
» 25378 Month
» 328568 Year
» 1550133 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3658 on 23/08/1941
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 831 on Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 931   28/12/1946
British Railways 60931   26/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Works Number 1924
To Service Fri 23/08/1941 to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)
Withdrawal Fri 03/09/1965 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 09/1965 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 24 yrs , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill (New) on 23/08/1941
HAY Haymarket m/e 12/1941
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill m/e 07/1944
HAY Haymarket on 29/10/1944
DEE Dundee Tay Bridge on 08/01/1950
64A St Margarets on 13/10/1958
65A Eastfield on 11/07/1960
65B St Rollox (Balornock) on 24/10/1960
64A St Margarets on 17/11/1960
   Withdrawn on 03/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 62B   w/e 14/01/1950
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 30/07/1960
WDN   w/e 03/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
23/08/1941 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 9232)
13/05/1944 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3469)
03/01/1946 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3227)
03/10/1947 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2912)
30/09/1949 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2907)
15/03/1952 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29531)
13/11/1953 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29502)
05/01/1956 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29490)
28/02/1958 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29500)
11/12/1958 Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
25/11/1959 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29421)
25/11/1959 Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
27/06/1963 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28080)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 19/06/1942 04/07/1942 16 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 10/04/1943 08/05/1943 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/04/1944 13/05/1944 36 days General
Boiler number 29473 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 24/11/1945 03/01/1946 41 days General
Boiler number 3227 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 23/04/1946 15/05/1946 23 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Darlington Works 29/08/1947 03/10/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 2912 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 01/02/1949 26/02/1949 26 days Light Casual
Renumbered to BR 60931
 
Darlington Works 31/08/1949 30/09/1949 31 days General
Boiler number 2907 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 18/02/1952 15/03/1952 27 days General
Boiler number 29531 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 17/03/1952 19/03/1952 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 10/10/1953 13/11/1953 35 days General
Boiler number 29502 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 23/11/1953 28/11/1953 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 29/11/1955 05/01/1956 38 days General
Boiler number 29490 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 09/01/1956 16/01/1956 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 23/01/1958 28/02/1958 37 days General
Boiler number 29500 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 30/10/1958 11/12/1958 43 days Heavy Casual
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
 
Darlington Works 26/10/1959 25/11/1959 31 days General
Boiler number 29421 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
 
Darlington Works 22/08/1961 20/09/1961 30 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 17/05/1963 27/06/1963 42 days General
Boiler number 28080 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 20/08/1965 20/08/1965 1 day No repairs  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/12/1942 N.E. Area engines in Dundee N.E. Area engines now visit Dundee fairly often, 'C.7's' 716 and 714 noted 12/12 and 19/12, and 'B.16' 931 on 25/12. 'V.2' 3667 worked 9.55 a.m, Edinburgh-Aberdeen on 25/12. SLS/194302
28/02/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). SLS/194904
11/02/1962 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. SLS/196204
05/05/1962 Bathgate MPD Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. SLS/196206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/08/1941 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3658
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1924
Allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
12/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
19/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/06/1942. Dep: 04/07/1942.    
10/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1943. Dep: 08/05/1943.    
08/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1944. Dep: 13/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29473 (Diagram 109)
   
07/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
29/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
24/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1945. Dep: 03/01/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3227 (Diagram 109)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 831 but not taken up    
23/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/04/1946. Dep: 15/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
28/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 931    
29/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1947. Dep: 03/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2912 (Diagram 109)
   
01/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/02/1949. Dep: 26/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 60931
   
31/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1949. Dep: 30/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2907 (Diagram 109)
   
08/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)    
18/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1952. Dep: 15/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29531 (Diagram 109)
   
17/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/03/1952. Dep: 19/03/1952.    
10/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1953. Dep: 13/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29502 (Diagram 109)
   
23/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/11/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953.    
29/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1955. Dep: 05/01/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29490 (Diagram 109)
   
09/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/01/1956. Dep: 16/01/1956.    
23/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1958. Dep: 28/02/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29500 (Diagram 109)
   
13/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
30/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/10/1958. Dep: 11/12/1958.
Work undertaken:
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
   
26/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1959. Dep: 25/11/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29421 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
   
11/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
24/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B)    
17/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
22/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/08/1961. Dep: 20/09/1961.    
17/05/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1963. Dep: 27/06/1963.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28080 (Diagram 109)
   
20/08/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 20/08/1965. Dep: 20/08/1965.    
03/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 60931 from St Margarets (64A)    

prev prev