|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 19/06/1942 | 04/07/1942 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/04/1943 | 08/05/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1944 | 13/05/1944 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29473 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/11/1945 | 03/01/1946 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3227 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1946 | 15/05/1946 | 23 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1947 | 03/10/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2912 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1949 | 26/02/1949 | 26 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 60931 |
||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1949 | 30/09/1949 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2907 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1952 | 15/03/1952 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 29531 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/03/1952 | 19/03/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1953 | 13/11/1953 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29502 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1953 | 28/11/1953 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/11/1955 | 05/01/1956 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29490 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/01/1956 | 16/01/1956 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1958 | 28/02/1958 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29500 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1958 | 11/12/1958 | 43 days | Heavy Casual | Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/10/1959 | 25/11/1959 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29421 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1961 | 20/09/1961 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 17/05/1963 | 27/06/1963 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 28080 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/08/1965 | 20/08/1965 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/12/1942 | N.E. Area engines in Dundee | N.E. Area engines now visit Dundee fairly often, 'C.7's' 716 and 714 noted 12/12 and 19/12, and 'B.16' 931 on 25/12. 'V.2' 3667 worked 9.55 a.m, Edinburgh-Aberdeen on 25/12. | SLS/194302 |
30/11/1946 | General | At this date (30/11/1946) only the following Scottish Area engines still require to be renumbered: 4488, 4491, 2745, 4819, 4891, 4898, 3658, 3682, 3692, 1996, 9765, 6897, 3057, 9499, 9886, 9384, 6398, 6399, 6401, 265, 320, 9201, 9204, 9368, 9255, 9263, 9429, 9046, 2980, 9632, 9644, 9668, 9757, 9790, 7348, 9524, 9527; a total of 37, or 3 per cent. of the total stock | SLS/194701 |
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
05/05/1962 | Bathgate MPD | Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. | SLS/196206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/08/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3658 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1890 Allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
12/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
19/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/06/1942. Dep: 04/07/1942. | ||
10/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1943. Dep: 08/05/1943. | ||
08/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1944. Dep: 13/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29473 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
29/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
24/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1945. Dep: 03/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3227 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 831 but not taken up | ||
23/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/04/1946. Dep: 15/05/1946. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
28/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 931 | ||
29/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1947. Dep: 03/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2912 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/02/1949. Dep: 26/02/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60931 |
||
31/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1949. Dep: 30/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2907 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
14/01/1950 | Allocation | |||
18/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1952. Dep: 15/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29531 (Diagram 109) |
||
17/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/03/1952. Dep: 19/03/1952. | ||
10/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1953. Dep: 13/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29502 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/11/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953. | ||
29/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1955. Dep: 05/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29490 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/01/1956. Dep: 16/01/1956. | ||
23/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1958. Dep: 28/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29500 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
30/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/10/1958. Dep: 11/12/1958. Work undertaken: Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
26/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1959. Dep: 25/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29421 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
11/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
24/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) | ||
17/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
22/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/08/1961. Dep: 20/09/1961. | ||
17/05/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1963. Dep: 27/06/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28080 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/08/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 20/08/1965. Dep: 20/08/1965. | ||
09/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
03/09/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60931 from St Margarets (64A) |