|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1943 | 18/12/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1945 | 05/01/1946 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1947 | 06/10/1947 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 29482 (Diagram 109) Modified pony truck |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1948 | 23/09/1948 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/10/1949 | 17/11/1949 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29384 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60936 |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1951 | 05/12/1951 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1953 | 27/10/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29378 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/06/1955 | 18/07/1955 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29351 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1957 | 06/12/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29524 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1958 | 30/06/1958 | 7 days | Heavy | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1960 | 12/03/1960 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 29424 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1961 | 02/05/1961 | 12 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/03/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3663 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1895 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
20/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1943. Dep: 18/12/1943. | ||
24/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
01/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1945. Dep: 05/01/1946. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 836 but not taken up | ||
18/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 936 | ||
10/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1947. Dep: 06/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29482 (Diagram 109) Modified pony truck |
||
20/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1948. Dep: 23/09/1948. | ||
10/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1949. Dep: 17/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29384 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60936 |
||
30/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/10/1951. Dep: 05/12/1951. | ||
27/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1953. Dep: 27/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29378 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1955. Dep: 18/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29351 (Diagram 109) |
||
04/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1957. Dep: 06/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29524 (Diagram 109) |
||
24/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 24/06/1958. Dep: 30/06/1958. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
16/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
14/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1960. Dep: 12/03/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29424 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
09/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
21/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/04/1961. Dep: 02/05/1961. | ||
23/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60936 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
15/10/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |