|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 07/09/1943 | 08/10/1943 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3227 (Diagram 109) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/11/1943 | 09/11/1943 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1944 | 26/10/1944 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1945 | 22/09/1945 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 3239 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1946 | 08/02/1947 | 55 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/01/1948 | 20/02/1948 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 3270 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E937 |
||
Darlington Works | 18/01/1950 | 18/03/1950 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 3368 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60937 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1950 | 08/07/1950 | 59 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 19/05/1952 | 19/06/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29543 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1952 | 27/06/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/05/1954 | 26/06/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29525 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/06/1956 | 10/07/1956 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29454 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1958 | 10/05/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29490 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/07/1958 | 12/08/1958 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/08/1959 | 21/10/1959 | 56 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 26/07/1960 | 08/09/1960 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29436 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Darlington Works | New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) | SLS/194804 |
23/02/1950 | Derby Works | New work: On 23/2 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42137-39 were complete-No, 42137 being in the Paint Shop-No, 42140 had the frames and cylinders erected and No. 42141 only the frames. New diesels Nos. 12067/68 were complete, while No. 12067 was noted in the Paint Shop-painted, with crest. Locomotives entering Works during: january: These included Nos. 40046, 49, 40322, 436, 490, 512, 40518/33, 540, 40553/59, 40601, 698, 40927, 937, 1043, 41057/76/81, 1112, 41114, 1252, 1425, 41532, 1686, 1711/20/26, 1835, 41873, 2306, 42320/46, 2365, 42392, 42405, 42504/07/13/25, 3228, 43329, 3429/53/94, 3605/20/55/60, 3714/24, 3804/13/30/67, 44017/47, 44131, 44262, 4423, 44466, 4468, 44482, 4522, 4557/81, 4820, 45305, 48205, 13806, 22984, W.R. No. 2112. On 5/1 No. 42363 was noted in the Paint Shop, fitted with outside steam pipes. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40045, 40163, 40553, 40634, 40917, 41094, 41166/74/88, 42310/63. In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos. 41682, 41711, 41859, 43431, 43524, 43658/60, 43714/23, 43917/50/64, 44423, 44601, 47409/21/99, 47528/51, 47623/31, while Nos. 40059, 40395, 40518, 40698, 41043, 41533, 41686, 42341/59/80, 42524/28, 43228, 43724, 43847, 43944, 47241, 47438, 53806 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 6/1 No. 40459; W/E 13/1 Nos. 1768, 7058, 9588; W/E 20/1 No.2100; W/E 27/1 No. 3813. Nos, 490, 512, an 3830 were also cut up during January, while No. 9573 was in the process of being cut up on 27/1. | SLS/195003 |
05/05/1962 | Bathgate MPD | Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. | SLS/196206 |
02/11/1963 | Inverurie Works (Cut Up) | Shopped: 42737, 45475, D6149, D8030. Cut Up: 60819/27, 60937, 64627, 65253, 65341. Four weeks ending 30th November, 1963. Shopped: 42909, 44955, 65918, D6147/57. Cut Up: 57269, 57336, 57634, 60840/94, 64950, 64629. Four weeks ending 28th December, 1963. Shopped: 42919, 44703, D3930, D6140/42/45/52/54/55/56. Cut Up: 60898, 60972, 64557, 64600, 65900, 90019. Total for 1963: Steam-33 Shopped, 31 other repairs; Diesel-31 Shopped, 15 other repairs; Cut Up 86. Two weeks ending 10th January, 1964. Shopped: 61132, D6150. Cut Up: 60161, 64619. In Shops on 10th January: 44722, 64558/99, D368, D3935, D6139/51/53. Awaiting scrapping: 60089, 60159, 64579. | SLS/196402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/03/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3664 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1896 Allocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
07/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1943. Dep: 08/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3227 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/11/1943. Dep: 09/11/1943. | ||
05/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/10/1944. Dep: 26/10/1944. | ||
08/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1945. Dep: 22/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3239 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 837 but not taken up | ||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 937 | ||
16/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/12/1946. Dep: 08/02/1947. | ||
06/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1948. Dep: 20/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3270 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E937 |
||
18/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1950. Dep: 18/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3368 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60937 |
||
11/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/05/1950. Dep: 08/07/1950. | ||
19/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1952. Dep: 19/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29543 (Diagram 109) |
||
24/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/06/1952. Dep: 27/06/1952. | ||
26/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1954. Dep: 26/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29525 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1956. Dep: 10/07/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29454 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/06/1957 | Report | Report: On June 11 "A3s" Nos. 60043/90 and 60100, all of Haymarket, were all seen on Leeds, together with "V2s" Nos. 60804 and 60937 of Dundee (Tay Bridge). No. 60937 appeared 100 min. late, piloted by standard Class "5" 4-6-0 No. 73166 (SOA), on the up "North Briton." (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957) | ||
08/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1958. Dep: 10/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29490 (Diagram 109) |
||
31/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/07/1958. Dep: 12/08/1958. | ||
13/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
27/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/08/1959. Dep: 21/10/1959. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
26/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1960. Dep: 08/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29436 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60937 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
01/11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |