|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 19/02/1944 | 25/03/1944 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/01/1946 | 23/02/1946 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/01/1947 | 31/03/1947 | 70 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/11/1948 | 24/12/1948 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29354 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60948 |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1950 | 24/11/1950 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/02/1951 | 19/03/1951 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1952 | 06/03/1952 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1952 | 01/01/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29363 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1955 | 10/02/1955 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29354 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/09/1956 | 03/11/1956 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29403 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1956 | 07/12/1956 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1958 | 10/12/1958 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29543 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 18/12/1958 | 29/12/1958 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1959 | 22/05/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 04/10/1961 | 22/12/1961 | 80 days | General | Boiler number 29433 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1962 | 18/01/1962 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/03/1962 | 23/03/1962 | 19 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/06/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3650 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1887 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
19/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1944. Dep: 25/03/1944. | ||
29/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 848 but not taken up | ||
26/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1946. Dep: 23/02/1946. | ||
20/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 948 | ||
21/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1947. Dep: 31/03/1947. | ||
30/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
15/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1948. Dep: 24/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29354 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60948 |
||
19/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/11/1950. Dep: 24/11/1950. | ||
19/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/02/1951. Dep: 19/03/1951. | ||
26/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/02/1952. Dep: 06/03/1952. | ||
03/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1952. Dep: 01/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29363 (Diagram 109) |
||
30/08/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
11/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1955. Dep: 10/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29354 (Diagram 109) |
||
30/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1956. Dep: 03/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29403 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/12/1956. Dep: 07/12/1956. | ||
03/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1958. Dep: 10/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29543 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
18/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/12/1958. Dep: 29/12/1958. | ||
21/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/05/1959. Dep: 22/05/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
04/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1961. Dep: 22/12/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29433 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
24/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
15/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/01/1962. Dep: 18/01/1962. | ||
05/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/03/1962. Dep: 23/03/1962. | ||
17/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
25/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60948 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
04/11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |