Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 169 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5923 Week
» 33881 Month
» 68523 Year
» 1290088 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3671   02/11/1942
LNER (1946 1st) 859   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 959   13/07/1946
BR 60959   14/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 02/11/1942 to Gateshead (GHD)
Withdrawal Mon 01/07/1963 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Scrapping Fri 04/10/1963 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 20 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Inverurie Works, 4/10/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GHD Gateshead (New) 02/11/1942
HTN Heaton 06/02/1949
64A St Margarets 13/02/1949
64B Haymarket 06/03/1949
64A St Margarets 28/10/1957
64B Haymarket 21/04/1958
64A St Margarets 11/04/1960
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 31/12/1962
   Withdrawn 01/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC STM St Margarets w/e 19/02/1949
ALLOC HAY Haymarket w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 64B Haymarket 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 07/05/1960
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 2w/e 12/01/1963
WDN   01/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/11/1942 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3307)
15/05/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3230)
22/08/1950 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3356)
17/12/1951 Modified pony truck
25/10/1952 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29481)
19/06/1954 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29524)
28/09/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29459)
09/07/1959 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28072)
09/07/1959 Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
16/03/1962 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29368)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 03/11/1944 09/12/1944 37 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/06/1946 13/07/1946 36 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 959
 
Darlington Works 23/10/1946 09/11/1946 18 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 24/03/1948 15/05/1948 53 days General
Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60959
 
Darlington Works 10/07/1950 22/08/1950 44 days General
Boiler number 3356 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 28/08/1950 06/09/1950 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 05/12/1951 17/12/1951 13 days Light Casual
Modified pony truck
 
Darlington Works 26/09/1952 25/10/1952 30 days General
Boiler number 29481 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 31/10/1952 05/11/1952 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 21/05/1954 19/06/1954 30 days General
Boiler number 29524 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 31/01/1956 13/03/1956 43 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 20/03/1956 23/03/1956 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 28/08/1957 28/09/1957 32 days General
Boiler number 29459 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 13/10/1958 13/11/1958 32 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 03/06/1959 09/07/1959 37 days General
Boiler number 28072 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
 
Darlington Works 29/07/1959 07/08/1959 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 30/01/1962 16/03/1962 46 days General
Boiler number 3137 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 27/12/1962 21/01/1963 26 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/11/1942 To Service To service as LNER Number 3671
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gateshead (GHD)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
03/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 859 but not taken up    
08/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1946. Dep: 13/07/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 959
   
23/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/10/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946.    
24/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1948. Dep: 15/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60959
   
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
13/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
06/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
10/07/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1950. Dep: 22/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3356 (Diagram 109)
   
28/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/08/1950. Dep: 06/09/1950.    
05/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/12/1951. Dep: 17/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Modified pony truck
   
26/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1952. Dep: 25/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29481 (Diagram 109)
   
31/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/10/1952. Dep: 05/11/1952.    
21/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1954. Dep: 19/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29524 (Diagram 109)
   
31/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 31/01/1956. Dep: 13/03/1956.    
20/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/03/1956. Dep: 23/03/1956.    
28/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1957. Dep: 28/09/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29459 (Diagram 109)
   
28/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
21/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
13/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/10/1958. Dep: 13/11/1958.    
03/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1959. Dep: 09/07/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28072 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
   
29/07/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/07/1959. Dep: 07/08/1959.    
11/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
11/02/1961 Sightings Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.   Link
30/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1962. Dep: 16/03/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3137 (Diagram 109)
   
27/12/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/12/1962. Dep: 21/01/1963.    
31/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
01/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 60959 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
04/10/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev