|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 02/11/1944 | 09/12/1944 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1946 | 17/08/1946 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1948 | 09/10/1948 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60961 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1950 | 20/01/1951 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29456 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1951 | 11/07/1951 | 30 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1952 | 14/02/1952 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1952 | 06/09/1952 | 61 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/12/1953 | 15/01/1954 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29535 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1954 | 27/01/1954 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/02/1955 | 02/04/1955 | 36 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/12/1955 | 18/01/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29532 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1957 | 09/02/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1958 | 15/03/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29470 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 16/02/1959 | 20/02/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1959 | 31/12/1959 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29495 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1961 | 04/10/1961 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1962 | 18/09/1962 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28082 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. | SLS/194812 |
04/03/1963 | GC line (Leicester shed) | Since the withdrawal of the local services from 4th March, Annesley shed now works the remaining semi-fast services (Nottingham-London) using Class 5s and Royal Scots. Woodford shed now has no passenger workings and its stud of ex LMR 2-6-4Ts (from Neasden) have been placed in store. Leicester shed has not been closed but its allocation has been reduced; on 16th March the following were on shed-42437/53/6, 44690, 45238, 45579, 48079; 46112, 60961 an 61374. Only latter was in steam. Leicester Central will be used during the summer for the former Belgrave Road station trains to Mablethorpe and Skegness (which ran on Saturdays and Sundays only). | SLS/196304 |
28/02/1963 | March MPD (Leicester shed) | Britannias 70000/1/2/3/5/6-13 were all placed in store at March in February due to further dieselisation by Type 3 diesels from Darnall and these now cover several March freight turns; three of the Britannias are understood to be unserviceable due to frost damage. On 30th March 70000/1/5/10/2 were transferred to Willesden leaving the others stored at the time. On 13th April, a visit to the shed revealed 70008/11/3 in steam acting as spare engines for diesel failures. J17 65541, which was stationary boiler here, has now been replaced by B1 61378. A new diesel depot is being built at March alongside the old repair shops and a further diesel depot is now under construction at Kings Lynn where 7 Brush and 6 small diesels are stationed. Several Brush diesels are now stabled in the old steam shed at Cambridge and 2 Brush diesels and one 204 h.p. stable at Ely. | SLS/196304 |
16/04/1963 | Malton MPD (Leicester shed) | The closure of Malton shed, recently forecast, as being likely to take place this summer, actually occurred officially on and from 16th April. All Malton’s steam locos. had however left during the preceding week, and on the official day of closure, the only steam loco. at the shed was 43055 (50A), on temporary standby. The two diesel shunters are now stabled overnight on a carriage siding under that part of the station roof which covers the Whitby bay platform. Since closure of Malton shed, local goods workings between York and Malton have been covered by 2-6-Os of 43XXX and 77XXX series; one of the latter type (including 77004 still with snowplough) brings the early morning goods from York and continues with the pick-up freight to Whitby, where it is remanned. The diesel shunters have been working the thrice-weekly trip on the Gilling branch, which is now disconnected at the Pilmoor end. The Ampleforth College Special from London to Gilling on 30th April, was worked from KX to Malton by A4 60017 Silver Fox and was replaced by 2-6-0 77004 still fitted with its small snowplough. Y7 0-4-0 ex-L.N.E.R. 985 is lying derelict at Bentinck Colliery (nr. Kirkby in Ashfield) and appears to have been out of use for some time. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/12/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3673 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1900 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
02/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 861 but not taken up | ||
13/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946. | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 961 | ||
23/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1948. Dep: 09/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60961 |
||
11/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1950. Dep: 20/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29456 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 12/06/1951. Dep: 11/07/1951. | ||
29/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/01/1952. Dep: 14/02/1952. | ||
08/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/07/1952. Dep: 06/09/1952. | ||
10/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1953. Dep: 15/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29535 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/01/1954. Dep: 27/01/1954. | ||
26/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1955. Dep: 02/04/1955. | ||
14/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1955. Dep: 18/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29532 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/02/1957. Dep: 09/02/1957. | ||
11/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1958. Dep: 15/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29470 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
16/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/02/1959. Dep: 20/02/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
27/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1959. Dep: 31/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29495 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/09/1961. Dep: 04/10/1961. | ||
14/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1962. Dep: 18/09/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28082 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
05/04/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60961 from York (North) (50A) | ||
12/07/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |