|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1944 | 13/01/1945 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1946 | 31/08/1946 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1948 | 23/10/1948 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2933 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/02/1951 | 22/03/1951 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29476 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1952 | 04/10/1952 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1952 | 08/10/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1953 | 12/12/1953 | 46 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1954 | 15/10/1954 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28055 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/04/1956 | 14/05/1956 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29549 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1958 | 08/02/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29434 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1958 | 12/02/1958 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1958 | 07/11/1958 | 5 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1959 | 24/04/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1960 | 08/06/1960 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29376 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1962 | 07/09/1962 | 73 days | General | Boiler number 29366 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. | SLS/194812 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington Works (Sidings) | Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/12/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3674 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1901 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
30/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1944. Dep: 13/01/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 862 but not taken up | ||
14/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 962 | ||
10/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946. | ||
22/05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60962 | ||
27/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1948. Dep: 23/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2933 (Diagram 109) |
||
19/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1951. Dep: 22/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29476 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/08/1952. Dep: 04/10/1952. | ||
06/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1952. Dep: 08/10/1952. | ||
28/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/10/1953. Dep: 12/12/1953. | ||
13/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1954. Dep: 15/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28055 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1956. Dep: 14/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29549 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
08/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1958. Dep: 08/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29434 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1958. Dep: 12/02/1958. | ||
03/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/11/1958. Dep: 07/11/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
22/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/04/1959. Dep: 24/04/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
02/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1960. Dep: 08/06/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29376 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1962. Dep: 07/09/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29366 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
20/09/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60962 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
10/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Ellis Metals: Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell |