|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1944 | 02/09/1944 | 29 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/11/1945 | 29/11/1945 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/10/1947 | 27/12/1947 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 3237 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1949 | 24/09/1949 | 34 days | Heavy Casual | Renumbered to BR 60963 |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/08/1950 | 29/09/1950 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29444 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1952 | 25/01/1952 | 11 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Darlington Works | 25/11/1952 | 03/01/1953 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28056 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/07/1954 | 14/08/1954 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 29488 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1954 | 09/09/1954 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1956 | 18/06/1956 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29515 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1958 | 24/04/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29375 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1959 | 04/03/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 23/12/1959 | 09/02/1960 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 29351 (Diagram 109) Double blastpipe fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 16/02/1960 | 22/02/1960 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/06/1961 | 31/08/1961 | 72 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1962 | 11/10/1962 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29484 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1963 | 31/05/1963 | 25 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/07/1961 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. | SLS/196108 |
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/01/1943 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3675 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1903 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
05/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1944. Dep: 02/09/1944. | ||
24/11/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
29/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 29/11/1945. Dep: 29/11/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 863 but not taken up | ||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 963 | ||
18/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1947. Dep: 27/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3237 (Diagram 109) |
||
26/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
01/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
22/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/08/1949. Dep: 24/09/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60963 |
||
28/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1950. Dep: 29/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29444 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/01/1952. Dep: 25/01/1952. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
25/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1952. Dep: 03/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28056 (Diagram 109) |
||
21/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1954. Dep: 14/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29488 (Diagram 109) |
||
04/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/09/1954. Dep: 09/09/1954. | ||
15/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1956. Dep: 18/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29515 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1958. Dep: 24/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29375 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
02/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1959. Dep: 04/03/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
23/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1959. Dep: 09/02/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29351 (Diagram 109) Double blastpipe fitted |
||
16/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/02/1960. Dep: 22/02/1960. | ||
21/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/06/1961. Dep: 31/08/1961. | ||
06/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1962. Dep: 11/10/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29484 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
07/05/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1963. Dep: 31/05/1963. | ||
29/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60963 from York (North) (50A) | ||
08/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |