|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 05/07/1944 | 12/08/1944 | 39 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1946 | 11/06/1946 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/12/1947 | 31/01/1948 | 41 days | General | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E964 |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/06/1949 | 06/08/1949 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 3234 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1951 | 07/06/1951 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29490 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1953 | 23/05/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29464 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/01/1955 | 05/02/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29452 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/02/1955 | 09/02/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/05/1956 | 27/06/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29508 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1956 | 26/11/1956 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1957 | 21/11/1957 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 25/02/1958 | 29/03/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29455 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1958 | 22/04/1958 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/04/1958 | 28/04/1958 | 5 days | Unclassified | Nameplates fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1959 | 15/01/1960 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29418 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/01/1955 | North eastern Miscellany | Class D20 62372, looking clean and polished, has been working on local passenger turns between Sunderland and Newcastle during March. On Sunday, 20th March, trains between Sunderland and West Hartlepool were diverted via Wellfield, due to work on track maintenance on the main line, and the 5.0 p.m. train from Newcastle to Liverpool hauled by V2 60964 was piloted from Sunderland by G5 67328 to give assistance up Seaton bank which is 1 in 42 for about half a mile at its steepest. On Sunday, 26th March, class 5 45316 was noted descending Seaton bank with an excursion from the Midland Region. Locomotives used for football excursions to Sunderland on 30/3 included Nos. 76046. 61018 an 64851. |
SLS/195505 |
29/04/1958 | Durham | V2 class 60964 was named Durham Light Infantry at Durham station on 29th April to commemorate the regiment's bicentenary. | SLS/195805 |
20/09/1964 | Swindon Works (Scrap yard) | On the occasion of the Society farewell to the last G.W.R. County class tour, the following were on works:- Erecting Shop: D602, D806/19/37/43/9, D1001/6/9/14/15/28/32/43/58, D6335/57, D7009/73, 2210, 6862, 6951, 7803, 7924, 43001/137, 73034 an 92223. New Construction: D9512 complete and painted, D9513-6 almost complete, D9517-24 under construction. Top end of shop, PWM653, D3026/32/190/807/14/24. Weighing shed: D850, D1049, Outside in works yard: 4659, 8405/9, 8732, 9425/27, 42954/78, 43115/20, 60941/45, D1016/24, D6352, D7048, N.C.B. 0-6-2T (ex T.V.R.) and King 6000 (for movement to Stratford). Scrap yard: 2818, 5698, 6010, 6824/7/73, 7929, 8418, 9484, 60809/12/33/6/87, 60916/22/5/32/64/75, 43012/112. Stock shed: D3352, D6826, D9510/11. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/01/1943 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3676 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1904 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
05/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1944. Dep: 12/08/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 864 but not taken up | ||
11/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1946. Dep: 11/06/1946. | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 964 | ||
22/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1947. Dep: 31/01/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E964 |
||
10/06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60964 | ||
23/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1949. Dep: 06/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3234 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1951. Dep: 07/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29490 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1953. Dep: 23/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29464 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1955. Dep: 05/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29452 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/02/1955. Dep: 09/02/1955. | ||
23/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1956. Dep: 27/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29508 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/11/1956. Dep: 26/11/1956. | ||
21/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 21/11/1957. Dep: 21/11/1957. | ||
25/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1958. Dep: 29/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29455 (Diagram 109) |
||
31/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/03/1958. Dep: 22/04/1958. | ||
24/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/04/1958. Dep: 28/04/1958. Work undertaken: Nameplates fitted |
||
29/04/1958 | Naming | Named 'THE DURHAM LIGHT INFANTRY' | ||
01/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1959. Dep: 15/01/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29418 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
08/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60964 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
07/09/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |