|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 25/01/1945 | 10/03/1945 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1946 | 04/01/1947 | 26 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 968 |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/06/1949 | 30/07/1949 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3042 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60968 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/08/1951 | 14/09/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3140 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1952 | 06/11/1952 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1953 | 30/04/1953 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1954 | 06/02/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29467 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1954 | 13/09/1954 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/05/1955 | 21/07/1955 | 56 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1956 | 07/12/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29545 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/10/1958 | 26/11/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29446 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 10/03/1959 | 12/03/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1961 | 28/04/1961 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 29405 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/05/1961 | 24/05/1961 | 13 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/04/1943 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3680 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1908 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
25/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 868 but not taken up | ||
10/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1946. Dep: 04/01/1947. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 968 |
||
23/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1949. Dep: 30/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3042 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60968 |
||
15/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1951. Dep: 14/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3140 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/10/1952. Dep: 06/11/1952. | ||
30/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 30/04/1953. Dep: 30/04/1953. | ||
07/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1954. Dep: 06/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29467 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/09/1954. Dep: 13/09/1954. | ||
27/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 27/05/1955. Dep: 21/07/1955. | ||
09/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1956. Dep: 07/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29545 (Diagram 109) |
||
24/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1958. Dep: 26/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29446 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
10/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/03/1959. Dep: 12/03/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
24/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1961. Dep: 28/04/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29405 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
12/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/05/1961. Dep: 24/05/1961. | ||
05/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
20/05/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60968 from York (North) (50A) |