Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 527 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6281 Week
» 34239 Month
» 68881 Year
» 1290446 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3682   12/05/1943
LNER (1946 1st) 870   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 970   28/12/1946
BR 60970   23/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
Works Number 1910
To Service Mon 12/05/1943 to Haymarket (HAY)
Withdrawal Mon 07/02/1966 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 03/1966 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 22 yrs, 8 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Motherwell Machinery and Scrap Co, Wishaw, 3/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HAY Haymarket (New) 12/05/1943
EFD Eastfield 05/11/1944
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 20/08/1945
PTH Perth (LNER) 12/06/1960
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 29/12/1962
64A St Margarets 19/07/1964
   Withdrawn 07/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 63A Perth South 4w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 7w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 08/08/1964
WDN   07/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/05/1943 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3360)
18/01/1947 Steam Brake fitted
18/01/1947 Steam Brake
18/01/1947 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3219)
23/12/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3283)
18/11/1950 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29447)
31/05/1952 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29540)
05/12/1953 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29521)
08/07/1955 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29466)
14/06/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29540)
24/03/1960 Smith speedometer fitted
12/04/1960 Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
24/03/1961 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29454)
29/01/1964 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29531)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 07/10/1944 04/11/1944 29 days General  
Darlington Works 20/11/1946 18/01/1947 60 days General
Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 109)
Steam Brake fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 970
 
Darlington Works 15/05/1947 14/06/1947 31 days General  
Darlington Works 08/11/1948 23/12/1948 46 days General
Boiler number 3283 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60970
 
Darlington Works 17/10/1950 18/11/1950 33 days General
Boiler number 29447 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 06/05/1952 31/05/1952 26 days General
Boiler number 29540 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 03/06/1952 05/06/1952 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 11/06/1952 16/06/1952 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 05/01/1953 16/01/1953 12 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 05/11/1953 05/12/1953 31 days General
Boiler number 29521 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 15/12/1953 19/12/1953 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 13/06/1955 08/07/1955 26 days General
Boiler number 29466 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 18/07/1955 23/07/1955 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 29/07/1957 13/08/1957 16 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 17/03/1959 29/04/1959 44 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 06/02/1960 24/03/1960 48 days General  
Darlington Works 09/02/1960 12/04/1960 64 days Heavy Casual
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
 
Darlington Works 25/11/1963 29/01/1964 66 days General
Boiler number 29531 (Diagram 109)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/05/1943 To Service To service as LNER Number 3682
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1910
Allocated to Haymarket (HAY)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
07/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1944. Dep: 04/11/1944.    
05/11/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD)    
20/08/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 870 but not taken up    
20/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1946. Dep: 18/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 109)
Steam Brake fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 970
   
15/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1947. Dep: 14/06/1947.    
08/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1948. Dep: 23/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3283 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60970
   
17/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1950. Dep: 18/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29447 (Diagram 109)
   
06/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1952. Dep: 31/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29540 (Diagram 109)
   
03/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/06/1952. Dep: 05/06/1952.    
11/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1952. Dep: 16/06/1952.    
05/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/01/1953. Dep: 16/01/1953.    
05/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1953. Dep: 05/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29521 (Diagram 109)
   
15/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/12/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953.    
13/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1955. Dep: 08/07/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29466 (Diagram 109)
   
18/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/07/1955. Dep: 23/07/1955.    
14/06/1957 Modification Diagram 109 number 29540 boiler fitted    
29/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/07/1957. Dep: 13/08/1957.    
17/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/03/1959. Dep: 29/04/1959.    
06/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1960. Dep: 24/03/1960.    
09/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/02/1960. Dep: 12/04/1960.
Work undertaken:
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
   
12/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Perth (LNER) (PTH)    
24/03/1961 Modification Diagram 109 number 29454 boiler fitted    
29/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
25/11/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1963. Dep: 29/01/1964.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29531 (Diagram 109)
   
19/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
07/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 60970 from St Margarets (64A)    
03/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev