|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 07/10/1944 | 04/11/1944 | 29 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/11/1946 | 18/01/1947 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 109) Steam Brakes fitted Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 970 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1947 | 14/06/1947 | 31 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1948 | 23/12/1948 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 3283 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60970 |
||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1950 | 18/11/1950 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29447 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1952 | 31/05/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 29540 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1952 | 05/06/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1952 | 16/06/1952 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/01/1953 | 16/01/1953 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/11/1953 | 05/12/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29521 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1953 | 19/12/1953 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1955 | 08/07/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 29466 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/07/1955 | 23/07/1955 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/07/1957 | 13/08/1957 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/03/1959 | 29/04/1959 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1960 | 24/03/1960 | 48 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1960 | 12/04/1960 | 64 days | Heavy Casual | Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 25/11/1963 | 29/01/1964 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 29531 (Diagram 109) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1946 | General | At this date (30/11/1946) only the following Scottish Area engines still require to be renumbered: 4488, 4491, 2745, 4819, 4891, 4898, 3658, 3682, 3692, 1996, 9765, 6897, 3057, 9499, 9886, 9384, 6398, 6399, 6401, 265, 320, 9201, 9204, 9368, 9255, 9263, 9429, 9046, 2980, 9632, 9644, 9668, 9757, 9790, 7348, 9524, 9527; a total of 37, or 3 per cent. of the total stock | SLS/194701 |
02/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103. Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329. |
SLS/194901 |
31/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. | SLS/194902 |
18/01/1964 | Darlington Works (under repair) | Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. | SLS/196402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/05/1943 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3682 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1910 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
07/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1944. Dep: 04/11/1944. | ||
05/11/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
20/08/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 870 but not taken up | ||
20/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1946. Dep: 18/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 109) Steam Brakes fitted Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 970 |
||
15/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1947. Dep: 14/06/1947. | ||
08/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1948. Dep: 23/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3283 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60970 |
||
17/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1950. Dep: 18/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29447 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1952. Dep: 31/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29540 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/06/1952. Dep: 05/06/1952. | ||
11/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1952. Dep: 16/06/1952. | ||
05/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/01/1953. Dep: 16/01/1953. | ||
05/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1953. Dep: 05/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29521 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/12/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953. | ||
13/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1955. Dep: 08/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29466 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/07/1955. Dep: 23/07/1955. | ||
14/06/1957 | Modification | Diagram 109 number 29540 boiler fitted | ||
29/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/07/1957. Dep: 13/08/1957. | ||
17/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/03/1959. Dep: 29/04/1959. | ||
06/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1960. Dep: 24/03/1960. | ||
09/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/02/1960. Dep: 12/04/1960. Work undertaken: Smith speedometer fitted |
||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Perth (LNER) (PTH) | ||
24/03/1961 | Modification | Diagram 109 number 29454 boiler fitted | ||
29/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
25/11/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1963. Dep: 29/01/1964. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29531 (Diagram 109) |
||
19/07/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
07/02/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60970 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
03/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |