Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1035 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7424 Week
» 27866 Month
» 364712 Year
» 1586277 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3684 on 01/07/1943
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 872 on Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 972   13/10/1946
British Railways 60972   14/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
Works Number 1913
To Service Thu 01/07/1943 to Eastfield (EFD)
Withdrawal Thu 28/11/1963 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Scrapping Fri 27/12/1963 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 20 yrs, 4 mths , 27 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Inverurie Works, 27/12/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill m/e 07/1943
EFD Eastfield (New) on 01/07/1943
EFD Eastfield m/e 10/1943
HAY Haymarket on 20/08/1945
62B Dundee Tay Bridge on 14/01/1951
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill on 02/01/1956
   Withdrawn on 28/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 3w/e 21/01/1956
WDN   on 28/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/07/1943 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3368)
14/06/1946 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3289)
14/05/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3368)
19/01/1950 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3154)
21/02/1953 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29459)
13/08/1955 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28050)
23/03/1959 Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
23/03/1959 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29407)
27/05/1961 Smith speedometer fitted
27/05/1961 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28058)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 26/09/1944 25/10/1944 30 days General  
Darlington Works 14/05/1946 14/06/1946 32 days General
Boiler number 3289 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 18/09/1947 16/10/1947 29 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 07/04/1948 14/05/1948 38 days General
Boiler number 3368 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60972
 
Darlington Works 18/05/1948 28/05/1948 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 13/12/1949 19/01/1950 38 days General
Boiler number 29482 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 09/04/1951 11/05/1951 33 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 06/12/1951 16/01/1952 42 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 19/05/1952 21/06/1952 34 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 20/01/1953 21/02/1953 33 days General
Boiler number 29459 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 23/02/1953 26/02/1953 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/03/1953 16/03/1953 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 15/07/1955 13/08/1955 30 days General
Boiler number 28050 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 19/09/1955 30/09/1955 12 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/05/1957 08/06/1957 33 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 11/06/1957 13/06/1957 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 18/02/1959 23/03/1959 34 days General
Boiler number 29407 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
 
Darlington Works 22/12/1959 24/12/1959 3 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 24/06/1960 11/07/1960 18 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 25/04/1961 27/05/1961 33 days General
Boiler number 28058 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/02/1963 Glasgow - Aberdeen Pacific workings The last regular workings of L.N.E.R Pacifics - during December and January, Ferryhill usually used 60009 an 60011 on the 7-10 a.m. to Glasgow (back with the 5-30 p.m.) but 60002/4/57/97/522/37 also appeared, whilst the standbies were 60527 or 60955 (rarely required). 60537 appeared on 25th January-one month after its 'withdrawal'! ' St. Rollox usually used 60027* on the 8-25 a.m. to Aberdeen (back with the 5-15 p.m.) with as standby 60031 or 60090, whilst 60012 was borrowed from Haymarket for most of November and December; other locomotives to appear were 60004/512/955/72 an 73153. * 60027 was in Grangemouth shed for repair on 11th February. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
01/07/1943 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3684
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1913
Allocated to Eastfield (EFD)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD)    
26/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1944. Dep: 25/10/1944.    
20/08/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 872 but not taken up    
14/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1946. Dep: 14/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3289 (Diagram 109)
   
13/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 972    
18/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/09/1947. Dep: 16/10/1947.    
07/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1948. Dep: 14/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3368 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60972
   
18/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/05/1948. Dep: 28/05/1948.    
13/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1949. Dep: 19/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29482 (Diagram 109)
   
14/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
09/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/04/1951. Dep: 11/05/1951.    
06/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/12/1951. Dep: 16/01/1952.    
19/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/05/1952. Dep: 21/06/1952.    
20/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1953. Dep: 21/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29459 (Diagram 109)
   
23/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1953. Dep: 26/02/1953.    
09/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1953. Dep: 16/03/1953.    
15/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1955. Dep: 13/08/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28050 (Diagram 109)
   
19/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/09/1955. Dep: 30/09/1955.    
02/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
07/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/05/1957. Dep: 08/06/1957.    
11/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1957. Dep: 13/06/1957.    
18/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1959. Dep: 23/03/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29407 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
   
22/12/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/12/1959. Dep: 24/12/1959.    
24/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/06/1960. Dep: 11/07/1960.    
25/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1961. Dep: 27/05/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28058 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
   
28/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 60972 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    

prev prev