Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 820 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2935 Week
» 25441 Month
» 328631 Year
» 1550196 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3685 on 27/04/1943
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 873 on Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 973   03/11/1946
British Railways 60973   07/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
Works Number 1914
To Service Mon 27/04/1943 to Haymarket (HAY)
Withdrawal Mon 24/01/1966 off Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)
Scrapping During 03/1966 at P.W. McLellan (Langloan)
Service Life 22 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to P & W McLellan, Langloan, 3/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HAY Haymarket (New) on 27/04/1943
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill m/e 07/1943
DEE Dundee Tay Bridge m/e 10/1943
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill on 11/04/1945
PTH Perth (LNER) on 30/05/1960
62B Dundee Tay Bridge on 09/07/1962
   Withdrawn on 24/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 63A Perth South 4w/e 04/06/1960
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 6w/e 18/08/1962
WDN   2w/e 13/04/1964
WDN   w/e 24/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
27/04/1943 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3373)
27/04/1946 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3229)
17/10/1947 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3101)
09/04/1949 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3099)
05/07/1952 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29548)
28/10/1955 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29459)
06/07/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29413)
14/08/1959 Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
04/06/1962 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3006)
23/01/1965 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29466)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 30/08/1944 23/09/1944 25 days General  
Darlington Works 18/03/1946 27/04/1946 41 days General
Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 03/09/1947 17/10/1947 45 days General
Boiler number 29497 (Diagram 109)
 
Cowlairs Works 04/03/1948 13/03/1948 10 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 09/04/1948 07/05/1948 29 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 60973
 
Cowlairs Works 10/01/1949 22/01/1949 13 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 08/03/1949 09/04/1949 33 days General
Boiler number 29477 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 19/02/1951 17/03/1951 27 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 09/06/1952 05/07/1952 27 days General
Boiler number 29548 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 20/01/1954 27/02/1954 39 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 04/03/1954 06/03/1954 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 12/03/1954 17/03/1954 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 22/03/1954 22/03/1954 1 day Unclassified  
Darlington Works 28/09/1955 28/10/1955 31 days General
Boiler number 29459 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 31/05/1957 06/07/1957 37 days General
Boiler number 29413 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 09/07/1957 10/07/1957 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 29/07/1957 02/08/1957 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 03/04/1958 14/05/1958 42 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 29/06/1959 14/08/1959 47 days Heavy Intermediate
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
 
Darlington Works 20/08/1959 03/09/1959 15 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 04/01/1960 08/01/1960 5 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 30/04/1962 04/06/1962 36 days General
Boiler number 29365 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 15/06/1962 09/07/1962 25 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/10/1962 02/11/1962 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 10/04/1964 22/05/1964 43 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 09/12/1964 23/01/1965 46 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 29466 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 25/01/1965 28/01/1965 4 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/07/1962 Darlington MPD (Ex Works) Stored: 43070 (51L), 43101 (51L), 65768, 65772, 65773, 69002 (51A), 78015 (51J). Ex Works: 43014 (50A), 43125 (50B), 60834 (62B), 60944 (52B), 60973 (63A), 62004 (51A), 63389 (51L), 68043 (51A), 90011 (51A), 90273 (51L), 90430 (51A), 92098 (52H). Awaiting Works: 42639 (50F), 43134 (66D), 46494 (31A), 60818 (64A), 64706 (52G), 64713, 64730 (51L), 64757 (51L), 64758 (51L), 64821 (51L), 64835 (51F), 64848 (51F), 64982 (51F), 65670, 65761, 65776. Visitors : D12 (55H), 42553 (50A), 60040 (52A). SLS/196209
25/04/1964 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D12, D25, D28, D181, D186, Dep. 84, D2078, D2605, D3140, D3455, D3656, D5106, D5155, D7591 painted, D7593 motors mounted, D7594, D7595 equipment fitted, D7596 body, 60124, 60133, 61016, 61256, 61289, 61388, 62065, 62067, 65882, 73004, 73071, 75056, 90047. Stripping Shop (Inside): 61306, 43033; Stripping Shop (Outside): 60011, 60864. Paint Shop (Inside): D182; Paint Shop (Outside): 75006 painted green. Level Crossing: D30, D3378 ex works, D3675, D7592 painted. Works Yard: D2700, D5166, D7597 body, 60973, 63399, 62057 frame, 65033, 65099, 73142 ex works, 90370 ex works. Works Shunter: 68037. Test House: Empty. North Road Scrap Yard: 63388, 65876. Shed (Waiting Works): 60020, 65880, 69020 Stored, 61304, 61321, 68046, 68051, 68054. SLS/196406
20/12/1964 Swindon Works (Dump: ble area) 'A' Shop: D9525-9541, D603, D803/7/8/14, D820/7, D830, D853/9, D860/3/6, D1000/57, D3039, D3196, D3743/5/61, D3808/15, D3822, D6307/26/30/8/53, D7005/14, L95, 42975, 43003/12/112. Weigh House: D1037. 'C' Shop: 5257, 8401 remains. Triangle: 7023 in steam. Turntable area: 4659, 7782, 8405/9, 9425/57, 42945, 92223. Dump: 2818, 3685, 4626, 5264, 5602, 6010, 6824, 6873, 7327, 8418, 9484, 9752, 78009. SLS/196502

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/04/1943 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3685
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1914
Allocated to Haymarket (HAY)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)    
30/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1944. Dep: 23/09/1944.    
11/04/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 873 but not taken up    
18/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1946. Dep: 27/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 109)
   
03/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 973    
03/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1947. Dep: 17/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29497 (Diagram 109)
   
04/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/03/1948. Dep: 13/03/1948.    
09/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/04/1948. Dep: 07/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 60973
   
10/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/01/1949. Dep: 22/01/1949.    
08/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1949. Dep: 09/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29477 (Diagram 109)
   
19/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/02/1951. Dep: 17/03/1951.    
09/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1952. Dep: 05/07/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29548 (Diagram 109)
   
20/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/01/1954. Dep: 27/02/1954.    
04/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/03/1954. Dep: 06/03/1954.    
12/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/03/1954. Dep: 17/03/1954.    
22/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/03/1954. Dep: 22/03/1954.    
28/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1955. Dep: 28/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29459 (Diagram 109)
   
31/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1957. Dep: 06/07/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29413 (Diagram 109)
   
09/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/07/1957. Dep: 10/07/1957.    
29/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/07/1957. Dep: 02/08/1957.    
03/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/04/1958. Dep: 14/05/1958.    
29/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/06/1959. Dep: 14/08/1959.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
   
20/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/08/1959. Dep: 03/09/1959.    
04/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/01/1960. Dep: 08/01/1960.    
30/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Perth (LNER) (PTH)    
30/04/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1962. Dep: 04/06/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29365 (Diagram 109)
   
15/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/06/1962. Dep: 09/07/1962.    
09/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
24/10/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/10/1962. Dep: 02/11/1962.    
10/04/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/04/1964. Dep: 22/05/1964.    
09/12/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/12/1964. Dep: 23/01/1965.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29466 (Diagram 109)
   
25/01/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/01/1965. Dep: 28/01/1965.    
24/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 60973 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    

prev prev