|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 30/08/1944 | 23/09/1944 | 25 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 18/03/1946 | 27/04/1946 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/09/1947 | 17/10/1947 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29497 (Diagram 109) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/03/1948 | 13/03/1948 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1948 | 07/05/1948 | 29 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 60973 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/01/1949 | 22/01/1949 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1949 | 09/04/1949 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29477 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/02/1951 | 17/03/1951 | 27 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 09/06/1952 | 05/07/1952 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 29548 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/01/1954 | 27/02/1954 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1954 | 06/03/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1954 | 17/03/1954 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1954 | 22/03/1954 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/09/1955 | 28/10/1955 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29459 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1957 | 06/07/1957 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29413 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1957 | 10/07/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/07/1957 | 02/08/1957 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/04/1958 | 14/05/1958 | 42 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1959 | 14/08/1959 | 47 days | Heavy Intermediate | Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 20/08/1959 | 03/09/1959 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1960 | 08/01/1960 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1962 | 04/06/1962 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29365 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1962 | 09/07/1962 | 25 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/10/1962 | 02/11/1962 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1964 | 22/05/1964 | 43 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1964 | 23/01/1965 | 46 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 29466 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1965 | 28/01/1965 | 4 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/07/1962 | Darlington MPD (Ex Works) | Stored: 43070 (51L), 43101 (51L), 65768, 65772, 65773, 69002 (51A), 78015 (51J). Ex Works: 43014 (50A), 43125 (50B), 60834 (62B), 60944 (52B), 60973 (63A), 62004 (51A), 63389 (51L), 68043 (51A), 90011 (51A), 90273 (51L), 90430 (51A), 92098 (52H). Awaiting Works: 42639 (50F), 43134 (66D), 46494 (31A), 60818 (64A), 64706 (52G), 64713, 64730 (51L), 64757 (51L), 64758 (51L), 64821 (51L), 64835 (51F), 64848 (51F), 64982 (51F), 65670, 65761, 65776. Visitors : D12 (55H), 42553 (50A), 60040 (52A). | SLS/196209 |
25/04/1964 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D12, D25, D28, D181, D186, Dep. 84, D2078, D2605, D3140, D3455, D3656, D5106, D5155, D7591 painted, D7593 motors mounted, D7594, D7595 equipment fitted, D7596 body, 60124, 60133, 61016, 61256, 61289, 61388, 62065, 62067, 65882, 73004, 73071, 75056, 90047. Stripping Shop (Inside): 61306, 43033; Stripping Shop (Outside): 60011, 60864. Paint Shop (Inside): D182; Paint Shop (Outside): 75006 painted green. Level Crossing: D30, D3378 ex works, D3675, D7592 painted. Works Yard: D2700, D5166, D7597 body, 60973, 63399, 62057 frame, 65033, 65099, 73142 ex works, 90370 ex works. Works Shunter: 68037. Test House: Empty. North Road Scrap Yard: 63388, 65876. Shed (Waiting Works): 60020, 65880, 69020 Stored, 61304, 61321, 68046, 68051, 68054. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/04/1943 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3685 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1914 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
30/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1944. Dep: 23/09/1944. | ||
11/04/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 873 but not taken up | ||
18/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1946. Dep: 27/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 973 | ||
03/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1947. Dep: 17/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29497 (Diagram 109) |
||
04/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/03/1948. Dep: 13/03/1948. | ||
09/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/04/1948. Dep: 07/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60973 |
||
10/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/01/1949. Dep: 22/01/1949. | ||
08/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1949. Dep: 09/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29477 (Diagram 109) |
||
19/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/02/1951. Dep: 17/03/1951. | ||
09/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1952. Dep: 05/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29548 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/01/1954. Dep: 27/02/1954. | ||
04/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/03/1954. Dep: 06/03/1954. | ||
12/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/03/1954. Dep: 17/03/1954. | ||
22/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/03/1954. Dep: 22/03/1954. | ||
28/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1955. Dep: 28/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29459 (Diagram 109) |
||
31/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1957. Dep: 06/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29413 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/07/1957. Dep: 10/07/1957. | ||
29/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/07/1957. Dep: 02/08/1957. | ||
03/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/04/1958. Dep: 14/05/1958. | ||
29/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/06/1959. Dep: 14/08/1959. Work undertaken: Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
20/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/08/1959. Dep: 03/09/1959. | ||
04/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/01/1960. Dep: 08/01/1960. | ||
30/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Perth (LNER) (PTH) | ||
30/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1962. Dep: 04/06/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29365 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/06/1962. Dep: 09/07/1962. | ||
09/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
24/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/10/1962. Dep: 02/11/1962. | ||
10/04/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/04/1964. Dep: 22/05/1964. | ||
09/12/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/12/1964. Dep: 23/01/1965. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29466 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/01/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/01/1965. Dep: 28/01/1965. | ||
24/01/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60973 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
03/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by P.W. McLellan: Langloan |