Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 137 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7878 Week
» 28320 Month
» 365166 Year
» 1586731 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3686 on 19/08/1943
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 874 on Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 974   19/05/1946
British Railways 60974   11/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
Works Number 1915
To Service Mon 19/08/1943 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 09/12/1963 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping Thu 09/01/1964 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 20 yrs, 3 mths , 20 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington Works for cutting up 9/1/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) on 19/08/1943
   Withdrawn on 09/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 09/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
19/08/1943 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3379)
14/08/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3039)
06/07/1950 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 9173)
17/12/1951 Modified pony truck
08/11/1952 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29463)
24/09/1954 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29545)
18/10/1956 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29519)
16/12/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
16/12/1958 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29408)
25/03/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
30/06/1961 Smith speedometer fitted
30/06/1961 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29341)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 28/04/1945 27/06/1945 61 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/10/1946 09/11/1946 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 21/06/1948 14/08/1948 55 days General
Boiler number 3039 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60974
 
Darlington Works 05/06/1950 06/07/1950 32 days General
Boiler number 29533 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 11/07/1950 13/07/1950 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 05/12/1951 17/12/1951 13 days Light Casual
Modified pony truck
 
Darlington Works 04/02/1952 23/02/1952 20 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/10/1952 08/11/1952 33 days General
Boiler number 29463 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 10/11/1952 11/11/1952 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 05/04/1954 12/04/1954 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/08/1954 24/09/1954 47 days General
Boiler number 29545 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 11/10/1954 18/10/1954 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 20/09/1956 18/10/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 29519 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 10/11/1958 16/12/1958 37 days General
Boiler number 29408 (Diagram 109)
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 23/03/1959 25/03/1959 3 days Unclassified
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 31/05/1961 30/06/1961 31 days General
Boiler number 29341 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/06/1961 Darlington Works (Stripping Shop) Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. SLS/196107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/08/1943 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3686
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1915
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
28/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1945. Dep: 27/06/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 874 but not taken up    
19/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 974    
12/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946.    
21/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1948. Dep: 14/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3039 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60974
   
05/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1950. Dep: 06/07/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29533 (Diagram 109)
   
11/07/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1950. Dep: 13/07/1950.    
05/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/12/1951. Dep: 17/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Modified pony truck
   
04/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/02/1952. Dep: 23/02/1952.    
07/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1952. Dep: 08/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29463 (Diagram 109)
   
10/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/11/1952. Dep: 11/11/1952.    
05/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/04/1954. Dep: 12/04/1954.    
09/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1954. Dep: 24/09/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29545 (Diagram 109)
   
11/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/10/1954. Dep: 18/10/1954.    
20/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1956. Dep: 18/10/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29519 (Diagram 109)
   
10/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1958. Dep: 16/12/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29408 (Diagram 109)
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
23/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/03/1959. Dep: 25/03/1959.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
31/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1961. Dep: 30/06/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29341 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
   
09/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 60974 from York (North) (50A)    

prev prev