|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 28/04/1945 | 27/06/1945 | 61 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1946 | 09/11/1946 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/06/1948 | 14/08/1948 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 3039 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60974 |
||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1950 | 06/07/1950 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29533 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1950 | 13/07/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/12/1951 | 17/12/1951 | 13 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Darlington Works | 04/02/1952 | 23/02/1952 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/10/1952 | 08/11/1952 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29463 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1952 | 11/11/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1954 | 12/04/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1954 | 24/09/1954 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29545 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1954 | 18/10/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1956 | 18/10/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29519 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1958 | 16/12/1958 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29408 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1959 | 25/03/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1961 | 30/06/1961 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29341 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Stripping Shop) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/08/1943 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3686 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1915 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
28/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1945. Dep: 27/06/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 874 but not taken up | ||
19/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 974 | ||
12/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946. | ||
21/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1948. Dep: 14/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3039 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60974 |
||
05/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1950. Dep: 06/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29533 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1950. Dep: 13/07/1950. | ||
05/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/12/1951. Dep: 17/12/1951. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
04/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/02/1952. Dep: 23/02/1952. | ||
07/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1952. Dep: 08/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29463 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/11/1952. Dep: 11/11/1952. | ||
05/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/04/1954. Dep: 12/04/1954. | ||
09/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1954. Dep: 24/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29545 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/10/1954. Dep: 18/10/1954. | ||
20/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1956. Dep: 18/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29519 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1958. Dep: 16/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29408 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
23/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/03/1959. Dep: 25/03/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
31/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1961. Dep: 30/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29341 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
09/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60974 from York (North) (50A) | ||
09/01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |