|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1944 | 28/10/1944 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 3011 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/09/1946 | 05/10/1946 | 29 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 975 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1948 | 21/08/1948 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 3338 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60975 |
||
Darlington Works | 20/11/1950 | 23/12/1950 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29465 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/12/1950 | 28/12/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1951 | 10/01/1951 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1952 | 02/04/1952 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/03/1953 | 11/04/1953 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29482 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1953 | 16/04/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1953 | 24/04/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/10/1954 | 11/11/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29493 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/09/1956 | 04/10/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29486 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/08/1957 | 19/08/1957 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1957 | 18/11/1957 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1958 | 29/07/1958 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29454 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1959 | 25/03/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1960 | 26/01/1961 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 2903 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1961 | 16/06/1961 | 23 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
20/09/1964 | Swindon Works (Scrap yard) | On the occasion of the Society farewell to the last G.W.R. County class tour, the following were on works:- Erecting Shop: D602, D806/19/37/43/9, D1001/6/9/14/15/28/32/43/58, D6335/57, D7009/73, 2210, 6862, 6951, 7803, 7924, 43001/137, 73034 an 92223. New Construction: D9512 complete and painted, D9513-6 almost complete, D9517-24 under construction. Top end of shop, PWM653, D3026/32/190/807/14/24. Weighing shed: D850, D1049, Outside in works yard: 4659, 8405/9, 8732, 9425/27, 42954/78, 43115/20, 60941/45, D1016/24, D6352, D7048, N.C.B. 0-6-2T (ex T.V.R.) and King 6000 (for movement to Stratford). Scrap yard: 2818, 5698, 6010, 6824/7/73, 7929, 8418, 9484, 60809/12/33/6/87, 60916/22/5/32/64/75, 43012/112. Stock shed: D3352, D6826, D9510/11. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/09/1943 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3687 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1917 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
31/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1944. Dep: 28/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3011 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 875 but not taken up | ||
07/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1946. Dep: 05/10/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 975 |
||
13/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1948. Dep: 21/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3338 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60975 |
||
20/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1950. Dep: 23/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29465 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/12/1950. Dep: 28/12/1950. | ||
04/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/01/1951. Dep: 10/01/1951. | ||
15/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/03/1952. Dep: 02/04/1952. | ||
05/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1953. Dep: 11/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29482 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1953. Dep: 16/04/1953. | ||
23/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/04/1953. Dep: 24/04/1953. | ||
09/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1954. Dep: 11/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29493 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1956. Dep: 04/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29486 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/08/1957. Dep: 19/08/1957. | ||
18/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 18/11/1957. Dep: 18/11/1957. | ||
13/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1958. Dep: 29/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29454 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
23/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/03/1959. Dep: 25/03/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
12/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1960. Dep: 26/01/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2903 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/05/1961. Dep: 16/06/1961. | ||
25/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60975 from York (North) (50A) | ||
08/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |