|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 12/05/1945 | 23/06/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1945 | 03/11/1945 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/12/1946 | 25/01/1947 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/07/1948 | 18/09/1948 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 3379 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60979 |
||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1950 | 02/09/1950 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29440 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/01/1952 | 10/01/1952 | 9 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1952 | 03/07/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29541 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/03/1954 | 30/04/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29526 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1954 | 20/05/1954 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/06/1954 | 15/06/1954 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/06/1954 | 03/07/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/02/1956 | 04/04/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29465 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1957 | 08/03/1957 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1958 | 30/04/1958 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29409 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1959 | 16/03/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1960 | 26/02/1960 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29455 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1962 | 21/06/1962 | 9 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/01/1944 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3691 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1923 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
12/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1945. Dep: 23/06/1945. | ||
27/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/10/1945. Dep: 03/11/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 879 but not taken up | ||
04/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 979 | ||
27/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947. | ||
26/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1948. Dep: 18/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3379 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60979 |
||
02/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1950. Dep: 02/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29440 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/01/1952. Dep: 10/01/1952. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
05/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1952. Dep: 03/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29541 (Diagram 109) |
||
26/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1954. Dep: 30/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29526 (Diagram 109) |
||
04/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/05/1954. Dep: 20/05/1954. | ||
10/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/06/1954. Dep: 15/06/1954. | ||
26/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/06/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954. | ||
29/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1956. Dep: 04/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29465 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
01/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/02/1957. Dep: 08/03/1957. | ||
23/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1958. Dep: 30/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29409 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
06/07/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
12/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/03/1959. Dep: 16/03/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
22/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1960. Dep: 26/02/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29455 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/06/1962. Dep: 21/06/1962. | ||
01/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60979 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
01/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |