|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 16/04/1945 | 17/05/1945 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 19/09/1945 | 20/10/1945 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2907 (Diagram 109) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 30/06/1946 | 13/07/1946 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1947 | 03/04/1947 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1948 | 10/09/1948 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 3356 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60980 |
||
Darlington Works | 07/10/1948 | 22/10/1948 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/11/1948 | 29/11/1948 | 29 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/06/1950 | 11/07/1950 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1952 | 22/08/1952 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29486 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1954 | 03/04/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 29539 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1954 | 06/04/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1954 | 21/04/1954 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1956 | 14/03/1956 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29473 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/03/1956 | 22/03/1956 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/03/1956 | 05/04/1956 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/07/1956 | 23/08/1956 | 51 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1957 | 28/01/1957 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1957 | 11/01/1958 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1958 | 05/09/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2903 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1958 | 19/12/1958 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1960 | 25/11/1960 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29441 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1960 | 21/12/1960 | 3 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1946 | General | At this date (30/11/1946) only the following Scottish Area engines still require to be renumbered: 4488, 4491, 2745, 4819, 4891, 4898, 3658, 3682, 3692, 1996, 9765, 6897, 3057, 9499, 9886, 9384, 6398, 6399, 6401, 265, 320, 9201, 9204, 9368, 9255, 9263, 9429, 9046, 2980, 9632, 9644, 9668, 9757, 9790, 7348, 9524, 9527; a total of 37, or 3 per cent. of the total stock | SLS/194701 |
31/08/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August | SLS/194810 |
03/10/1948 | Darlington Works | The first new 'A.1,' No. 60130, was on trial W/E 24/9 and No. 60131 during W/E 2/10, both are nameless. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 517, 2342/71, 3344, 5027/28, 5852/83, 7300/07, 8141, E8723, 9392, 9881, 61638, 63099, 69841 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60804, 60980, 62729/75, 63333/91, 65666/92, 65752, 68302/99, 68675, 68744, 69868 and 'Austerity' 77050. No. 9089 was broken up W/E 24/9. | SLS/194811 |
01/11/1948 | Darlington Works | The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's. It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable. |
SLS/194812 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/03/1944 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3692 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1926 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
16/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/04/1945. Dep: 17/05/1945. | ||
19/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1945. Dep: 20/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2907 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 880 but not taken up | ||
30/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/06/1946. Dep: 13/07/1946. | ||
12/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 980 | ||
13/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1947. Dep: 03/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1948. Dep: 10/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3356 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60980 |
||
07/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/10/1948. Dep: 22/10/1948. | ||
01/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/11/1948. Dep: 29/11/1948. | ||
08/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
14/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
07/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1950. Dep: 11/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
11/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
09/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1952. Dep: 22/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29486 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1954. Dep: 03/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29539 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/04/1954. Dep: 06/04/1954. | ||
13/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1954. Dep: 21/04/1954. | ||
09/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1956. Dep: 14/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29473 (Diagram 109) |
||
21/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/03/1956. Dep: 22/03/1956. | ||
28/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/03/1956. Dep: 05/04/1956. | ||
04/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/07/1956. Dep: 23/08/1956. | ||
08/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/01/1957. Dep: 28/01/1957. | ||
11/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/12/1957. Dep: 11/01/1958. | ||
05/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1958. Dep: 05/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2903 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
15/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/12/1958. Dep: 19/12/1958. | ||
10/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1960. Dep: 25/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29441 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
19/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/12/1960. Dep: 21/12/1960. | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60980 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |