|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 15/06/1946 | 20/07/1946 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/01/1948 | 20/02/1948 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29393 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E983 |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1950 | 10/03/1950 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 29403 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60983 |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/03/1950 | 05/04/1950 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1950 | 06/10/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1952 | 02/04/1952 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1953 | 12/02/1953 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/06/1953 | 29/07/1953 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 29373 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1955 | 02/04/1955 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29359 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/08/1956 | 05/09/1956 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29409 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1958 | 21/02/1958 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29530 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 06/04/1960 | 14/05/1960 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29380 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/05/1960 | 18/05/1960 | 1 day | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 16/02/1961 | 16/03/1961 | 29 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/07/1944 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3695 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1936 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
25/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 883 but not taken up | ||
25/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 983 | ||
15/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1946. Dep: 20/07/1946. | ||
06/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
21/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1948. Dep: 20/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29393 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E983 |
||
15/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1950. Dep: 10/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29403 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60983 |
||
31/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/03/1950. Dep: 05/04/1950. | ||
03/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/10/1950. Dep: 06/10/1950. | ||
02/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/03/1952. Dep: 02/04/1952. | ||
05/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1953. Dep: 12/02/1953. | ||
07/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1953. Dep: 29/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29373 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1955. Dep: 02/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29359 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1956. Dep: 05/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29409 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1958. Dep: 21/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29530 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
06/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1960. Dep: 14/05/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29380 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/05/1960. Dep: 18/05/1960. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
16/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/02/1961. Dep: 16/03/1961. | ||
17/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
23/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60983 from Grantham (34F) | ||
13/12/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |