Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1964 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19767 Week
» 72783 Month
» 192310 Year
» 3219163 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) |
391 |
m/e |
10/1939 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7683 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
67683 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
V3 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Order Number |
347 |
Works Number |
1903 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 10/1939 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 23/09/1963 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 11 mths , 24 dys |
Information |
Hopper bunker |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52C |
Blaydon |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
ALLOC |
52DALN |
|
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
ALLOC |
52A |
Gateshead |
4w/e |
06/07/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/09/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/04/1950 |
\"V.3\" Renumbering |
With the renumbering of 7683 to 67683 on 28/4, the renumbering of class 'V.3' is complete, though the date on which 67669 was done has escaped record (N.B. now believed to have been renumbered in 8/1949). |
SLS/195007 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1939 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 391 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7683 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67683 |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
23/09/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67683 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|