Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 331 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18134 Week
» 71150 Month
» 190677 Year
» 3217530 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) |
393 |
m/e |
12/1939 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7685 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
67685 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
V3 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Order Number |
347 |
Works Number |
1905 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1939 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 10/12/1962 |
Service Life |
23 yrs , 10 dys |
Information |
Hopper bunker |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1939 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 393 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7685 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Middlesbrough (MID) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67685 |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
10/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67685 |
|
|
22/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
04/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|