Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 129 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4641 Week
» 27147 Month
» 330337 Year
» 1551902 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1943) 3402 on 21/03/1941
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1701   07/07/1946
British Railways 61701   03/04/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
21/03/1941 BANTAM HEN

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V4
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 355
Works Number 1920
To Service Tue 21/03/1941 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Tue 26/11/1957 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock)
Service Life 16 yrs, 8 mths , 5 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
LNER 3,500g Group Standard 5725 21/03/1941 LNER 3,500g
LNER 3,500g Group Standard 5714 06/1946 LNER 3,500g

Notes
Notes Works records for the period 1941 to August 1944 do not show entry dates - given entry dates for this period are by estimation.
Into Kilmarnock Works for cutting up, 7/2/58

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) on 21/03/1941
EFD Eastfield on 12/09/1941
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill on 24/05/1954
   Withdrawn on 26/11/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 15/05/1954
WDN   on 26/11/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
21/03/1941 Diagram 113 boiler fitted (number 9228)
05/03/1955 Water pick-up apparatus removed


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Cowlairs Works 20/01/1942 30/01/1942 11 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 23/04/1942 02/05/1942 10 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 07/08/1942 19/09/1942 44 days Heavy  
Cowlairs Works 13/01/1943 23/01/1943 11 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 15/02/1943 25/02/1943 11 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 18/04/1943 28/04/1943 11 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 25/06/1943 05/07/1943 11 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 10/10/1943 20/10/1943 11 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 01/01/1944 05/02/1944 36 days General  
Cowlairs Works 06/03/1944 16/03/1944 11 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 24/04/1944 03/05/1944 10 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 05/05/1944 12/05/1944 8 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 27/06/1944 07/07/1944 11 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 31/07/1944 10/08/1944 11 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 30/12/1944 05/01/1945 7 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 10/02/1945 10/02/1945 1 day Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 03/03/1945 16/03/1945 14 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 17/03/1945 16/06/1945 92 days General
Thermic syphon removed
 
Cowlairs Works 22/09/1945 22/09/1945 1 day Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 06/10/1945 13/10/1945 8 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 20/04/1946 04/05/1946 15 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 03/08/1946 03/08/1946 1 day Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 19/04/1947 26/04/1947 8 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 21/06/1947 28/06/1947 8 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 18/10/1947 25/10/1947 8 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 31/03/1948 03/04/1948 4 days Light Casual
Renumbered to BR 61701
 
Cowlairs Works 07/05/1948 18/06/1948 43 days General  
Cowlairs Works 05/07/1949 10/09/1949 68 days General  
Cowlairs Works 14/11/1949 02/12/1949 19 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 11/08/1950 18/08/1950 8 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 19/09/1950 14/10/1950 26 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 19/12/1950 22/12/1950 4 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 16/02/1951 22/02/1951 7 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 20/09/1951 22/09/1951 3 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 05/02/1953 28/02/1953 24 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 11/03/1953 12/03/1953 2 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 02/11/1953 05/11/1953 4 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 13/01/1954 23/01/1954 11 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 14/06/1954 10/07/1954 27 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 06/12/1954 05/03/1955 90 days General
Water pick-up apparatus removed
 
Cowlairs Works 08/03/1955 09/03/1955 2 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 28/04/1955 05/05/1955 8 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 10/01/1956 28/01/1956 19 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 22/08/1956 15/09/1956 25 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 04/12/1956 08/12/1956 5 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 24/12/1956 29/12/1956 6 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 17/01/1957 18/01/1957 2 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/10/1947 Eastfield MPD Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during October were: Nos. 1743/46/51/68, *1791 (green), 1879, 2432/62/73/95, 2685/91 (both green), 4526/65/67/98, 4607, 4703/04, 4852, 4926/28/42, 5345, 7461/69/97, *8474 (green), 9147/91 an 9205; whilst those observed on 2/11 were *1995 (green), 4608, 4938 an 9500 . Nos. 1701, 1996 an 1998 were observed here fitted with snow-ploughs. Nos. 2479, 4474 an 4633 have been supplying steam to the canteen here during the period approximately from 15/10 to 26/10, while No. 5308 is again in use as a stationary boiler, after having been temporarily replaced by No. 5339. SLS/194712
30/11/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 60501/05, 61002, 1293, 61701/49/86/88, 61857, 61909, 2422, 62426, 62706, 3049, 3126, 4548/90, 4615/16, 4706, 64794, 4842, 4923/41, 5902, 65907, 5909/12/26, 7477, 67608, 8121, 8445, 8503, 8952, 9143/76/88, 69199, 9205, 90004, 73798, 77342/71. SLS/195001

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/03/1941 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3402, name: BANTAM HEN
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1920
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Tender fitted: LNER 3,500g Group Standard
Diagram 113 boiler fitted
   
12/09/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD)    
20/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1942. Dep: 30/01/1942.    
23/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/04/1942. Dep: 02/05/1942.    
07/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/08/1942. Dep: 19/09/1942.    
13/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/01/1943. Dep: 23/01/1943.    
15/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/02/1943. Dep: 25/02/1943.    
18/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/04/1943. Dep: 28/04/1943.    
25/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/06/1943. Dep: 05/07/1943.    
10/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/10/1943. Dep: 20/10/1943.    
01/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1944. Dep: 05/02/1944.    
06/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/03/1944. Dep: 16/03/1944.    
24/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/04/1944. Dep: 03/05/1944.    
05/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/05/1944. Dep: 12/05/1944.    
27/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/06/1944. Dep: 07/07/1944.    
31/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/07/1944. Dep: 10/08/1944.    
30/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/12/1944. Dep: 05/01/1945.    
10/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1945. Dep: 10/02/1945.    
03/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/03/1945. Dep: 16/03/1945.    
17/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1945. Dep: 16/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Thermic syphon removed
   
22/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/09/1945. Dep: 22/09/1945.    
06/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/10/1945. Dep: 13/10/1945.    
20/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/04/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946.    
06/1946 Tender Tender fitted: LNER 3,500g Group Standard number 5714    
07/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1701    
03/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/08/1946. Dep: 03/08/1946.    
19/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/04/1947. Dep: 26/04/1947.    
21/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/06/1947. Dep: 28/06/1947.    
18/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/10/1947. Dep: 25/10/1947.    
31/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/03/1948. Dep: 03/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61701
   
07/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1948. Dep: 18/06/1948.    
05/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1949. Dep: 10/09/1949.    
14/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/11/1949. Dep: 02/12/1949.    
11/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/08/1950. Dep: 18/08/1950.    
19/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/09/1950. Dep: 14/10/1950.    
19/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/12/1950. Dep: 22/12/1950.    
16/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/02/1951. Dep: 22/02/1951.    
20/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/09/1951. Dep: 22/09/1951.    
05/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/02/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953.    
11/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/03/1953. Dep: 12/03/1953.    
02/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/11/1953. Dep: 05/11/1953.    
13/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/01/1954. Dep: 23/01/1954.    
24/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
14/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/06/1954. Dep: 10/07/1954.    
06/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1954. Dep: 05/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Water pick-up apparatus removed
   
08/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/03/1955. Dep: 09/03/1955.    
28/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/04/1955. Dep: 05/05/1955.    
10/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/01/1956. Dep: 28/01/1956.    
22/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 22/08/1956. Dep: 15/09/1956.    
04/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/12/1956. Dep: 08/12/1956.    
24/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/12/1956. Dep: 29/12/1956.    
17/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1957. Dep: 18/01/1957.    
26/11/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 61701 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    

prev